This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 13:44:37 (UTC).

ANAIT PARSAMYAN VS DESCANSO GARDENS GUILD INC

Case Summary

On 06/02/2016 ANAIT PARSAMYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DESCANSO GARDENS GUILD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2501

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PARSAMYAN ANAIT

Respondents and Defendants

DESCANSO GARDENS GUILD INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GEZOUKIAN & NALBANDYAN PC

Defendant Attorney

KESSEL ELIZABETH M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/23/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Answer

7/28/2016: Answer

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

6/2/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

SUMMONS

6/2/2016: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 98; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 98; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Anait Parsamyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Descanso Gardens Guild, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Anait Parsamyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESCANSO GARDENS GUILD INC is a litigant