This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:02:04 (UTC).

ANA UMANA ET AL VS STUDIO POINTE APTS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/06/2015 ANA UMANA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STUDIO POINTE APTS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7246

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ALVARADO JOANA

GONZALEZ EDWIN

MARTINEZ MIGUEL

MARTINEZ VICTOR

MONTELONGO VICTORIA HUGO

SANCHEZ LINDA

UMANA ANA

Defendants and Respondents

ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 50

STUDIO POINTE APT. LLC

STUDIO POINTE APTS. INC.

Other

LAW OFFICES OF LEE & GREEN PC

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MACAULEY EKPENISI

EKPENISI MACAULEY LAW OFFICES OF

STONECROFT PARTNERS LLP

OCEANBRIDGE LAW FIRM A PROF. LAW CORP.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JONES KEVIN B. LAW OFFICES OF

JONES KEVIN B. ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF LEE & GREEN PC

LEE & GREEN P.C.

DAVID CAMPBELL SMITH ATTORNEY AT LAW

PERRY G. CAMERON ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF JEFFREY W. KORN

 

Court Documents

Statement of Decision

8/15/2018: Statement of Decision

Minute Order

10/18/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

7/6/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

SUMMONS

7/6/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/6/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/6/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/6/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/6/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OP MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; ETC.

8/19/2015: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OP MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; ETC.

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/24/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

FRIST AMENDED SUMMONS

11/6/2015: FRIST AMENDED SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC.

11/6/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/20/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF KEVIN B. JONES, AND ANIL MEHTA IN SUPPORT

11/30/2015: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF KEVIN B. JONES, AND ANIL MEHTA IN SUPPORT

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

12/8/2015: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

Minute Order

12/8/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

1/21/2016: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

11/30/2016: NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUBMISSION OF (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department A; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Statement of Decision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Statement of Decision; Filed by Anza Management Company (Defendant); Studio Pointe Apts. Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Ana Umana (Plaintiff); Joana Alvarado (Plaintiff); Edwin Gonzalez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.