Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 07:11:39 (UTC).

ANA ARGUETA VS DA/PRO RUBBER INC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 ANA ARGUETA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DA/PRO RUBBER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES R. DUNN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2379

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES R. DUNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARGUETA ANA

Defendants

DA/PRO RUBBER INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN JAY S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BARNESW & THORNBURG LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. RETALIATION (LABOR CODE 1102.5); ETC

10/28/2011: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. RETALIATION (LABOR CODE 1102.5); ETC

DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

12/5/2011: DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

DEFENDANT DA/PRO RUBBFIR, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ANA ARGUETA?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

12/29/2011: DEFENDANT DA/PRO RUBBFIR, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ANA ARGUETA?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/3/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

2/23/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

3/21/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

10/3/2012: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

10/3/2012: DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF STEVE L. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

10/3/2012: DECLARATION OF STEVE L. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

NOTICE OF RULING ON CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE

10/17/2012: NOTICE OF RULING ON CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE

Minute Order -

12/5/2012: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF TINA SOHAILI IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

12/5/2012: DECLARATION OF TINA SOHAILI IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

DECLARATION OF SCOTT J. WITLIN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

12/5/2012: DECLARATION OF SCOTT J. WITLIN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

DECLARATION OF STEVE L. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

12/5/2012: DECLARATION OF STEVE L. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE

12/5/2012: DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE

DECLARATION OF DAVID L. SIIANE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/18/2013: DECLARATION OF DAVID L. SIIANE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF STEVE L. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/18/2013: DECLARATION OF STEVE L. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/18/2013: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 26; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 26; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 26; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 26; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 26; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ana Argueta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 26; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketStatement of Facts; Filed by Da/Pro Rubber, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Da/Pro Rubber, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2011
  • DocketDEFENDANT DA/PRO RUBBFIR, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ANA ARGUETAS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Ana Argueta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ana Argueta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ana Argueta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. RETALIATION (LABOR CODE 1102.5); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less