This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 03:01:28 (UTC).

AMY FLEETMAN VS. VERMONT BREEZE APARTMENTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2012 AMY FLEETMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VERMONT BREEZE APARTMENTS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, RAMONA G. SEE and DUDLEY W. GRAY II. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6211

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

RAMONA G. SEE

DUDLEY W. GRAY II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLEETMAN AMY

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

VERMONT BREEZE APARTMENTS INC.

ANAHEIM PARTNERS DOE 1

SILIGMAN & ASSOCIATES AS DOE 2

SCOTT MANAGEMENT AS DOE 3

ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Other

KORNARENS ANTHONY

Not Classified By Court

TELL FRANKLIN D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHONBRUN BENJAMIN

LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY KORNARENS

KORNARENS ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BAKER & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/3/2012: Complaint

Answer

2/8/2012: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/8/2012: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL

6/8/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

6/19/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Answer

9/12/2012: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

10/25/2012: Substitution of Attorney

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STIPULATION AND ORDER

1/11/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STIPULATION AND ORDER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

1/22/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STIPULATION AND ORDER

1/22/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STIPULATION AND ORDER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

2/19/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

2/25/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/26/2013: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/2/2013: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/10/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AN MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FURTHER DECLARATIAN OF ANTHONY KORNARENS

4/16/2013: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AN MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FURTHER DECLARATIAN OF ANTHONY KORNARENS

`F AMENDED 1LT*1AGES 1 EGLEGENCE; VIOLA &F ALIORNIA DISABLEI PERSONS ACT AND 5) VIOLATIONS OF CALIFOKNIA UNRUH ACT; U N-N.I NR II PI,RNNCNC IN

4/24/2013: `F AMENDED 1LT*1AGES 1 EGLEGENCE; VIOLA &F ALIORNIA DISABLEI PERSONS ACT AND 5) VIOLATIONS OF CALIFOKNIA UNRUH ACT; U N-N.I NR II PI,RNNCNC IN

Minute Order -

4/24/2013: Minute Order -

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2013
  • Docketat 08:34 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-09-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-09-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by AMY FLEETMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Not Held-Removed ADR-Other) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Docketin Department ADR, ADR Clerk, Presiding; Closed-ADR - Not Held-Removed ADR-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • Docketat 08:33 AM in Department 91; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by AMY FLEETMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by AMY FLEETMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMY FLEETMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMY FLEETMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by AMY FLEETMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less