Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2014 at 21:02:20 (UTC).

AMY BESSONE VS THOMAS HOUSEAGO

Case Summary

On 08/12/2014 AMY BESSONE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOMAS HOUSEAGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6377

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BESSONE AMY

Defendant

HOUSEAGO THOMAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2014
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BD606377    Hearing Date: January 11, 2021    Dept: 42

On Respondent's RFO filed October 16, 2020, for an early and separate trial on the issue of an alternate valuation date for commercial real properties to be valued as of December 19, 2013, the Court's tentative ruling is as follows:

In view of the Trial on Reserved Issues, currently scheduled to commence on January 11, 2021, the request for bifurcation of, and a separate trial on, the issue of the applicable valuation date for the subject properties is DENIED. 

The merits of the issue, i.e., the applicable valuation date for the subject properties, is not decided by this ruling.  The merits of the issue shall be heard as part of the Trial on Reserved Issues.