This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 01:06:07 (UTC).

AMMAR AHMAD VS SEAN ROBBINS ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/09/2016 AMMAR AHMAD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SEAN ROBBINS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9826

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AHMAD AMMAR

Defendants and Respondents

ROBBINS SEAN

BLACKHAWK CAPITAL GROUP

BARRIOS ELIZABETH

DOES 1-15

GRAMMAJO BRONLIN A.

COLLETTI JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GAGLIANO RICHARD CHARLES ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/29/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/26/2018: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER HEARING DATE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

3/30/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER HEARING DATE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/6/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Ex Parte Application

11/13/2018: Ex Parte Application

Unknown

11/15/2018: Unknown

Unknown

11/15/2018: Unknown

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice

3/29/2019: Notice

Response

4/5/2019: Response

Minute Order

4/16/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

4/16/2019: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Request

4/29/2019: Request

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

5/9/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

AMENDING THE NAMED DEFENDANTS IN THE COMPLAINT

6/3/2016: AMENDING THE NAMED DEFENDANTS IN THE COMPLAINT

1ST. AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/18/2017: 1ST. AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

10/23/2017: Minute Order

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Ammar Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by Ammar Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Response (RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT WAS NOT SUBMITTED); Filed by Ammar Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Response (ORDER TO SHOW Cause why Case WHY DEFENDANT COLLETTI Was not served.); Filed by Ammar Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Response (to ORDER TO SHOW Cause why DEFENDANTS ELIZABETH Barrios and BRONLIN A GRAMMAJO); Filed by Ammar Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Motion for Sanctions; Filed by Ammar Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (TENTATIVE RULING COMPEL ANSWERS) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by John Colletti (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate TENTATIVE RULING COMPEL ANSWERS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ammar Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • AMENDING THE NAMED DEFENDANTS IN THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Ammar Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Ammar Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Ammar Ahmad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC619826    Hearing Date: September 09, 2020    Dept: 31

MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS OFF CALENDAR

Plaintiff Ammar Ahmad’s Motion for Reconsideration is placed OFF CALENDAR.

“A court may reconsider its order granting or denying a motion and may even reconsider or alter its judgment so long as judgment has not yet been entered. Once judgment has been entered, however, the court may not reconsider it and loses its unrestricted power to change the judgment. It may correct judicial error only through certain limited procedures such as motions for new trial and motions to vacate the judgment.” (APRI Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (1999) 76 Cal.App.4th 176, 181 (internal citations omitted).)

“A motion to reconsider is not valid if it is filed after the final judgment is signed.” (Branner v. Regents of University of California (2009) 175 Cal.App.4th 1043, 1048 (internal citations omitted).)

Here, a judgment of dismissal was entered on October 18, 2019, pursuant to the Court’s October 16, 2019 Minute Order granting Defendant’s Motion for Terminating Sanctions. Plaintiff filed the instant motion on October 28, 2019. Accordingly, the instant motion was filed after judgment was entered. The Court therefore does not have jurisdiction to entertain the instant motion.

Clerk to give notice.

The parties are strongly encouraged to attend all scheduled hearings virtually or by audio. Effective July 20, 2020, all matters will be scheduled virtually and/or with audio through the Court’s LACourtConnect technology. The parties are strongly encouraged to use LACourtConnect for all their matters. All social distancing protocols will be observed at the Courthouse and in the courtrooms.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAGLIANO RICHARD CHARLES