This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2016 at 18:55:31 (UTC).

AMEY ENTERPRISES,INC. VS. PLATINUM VIP COLLECTIVE,INC. ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/15/2013 AMEY ENTERPRISES,INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against PLATINUM VIP COLLECTIVE,INC ETAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1192

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMEY ENTERPRISES INC.

Defendants

ECHEVERRIA YOLIVETH

PLATINUM VIP COLLECTIVE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZKOLNIK FRED M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (W/O PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketWrit-Other (WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • DocketApplication - Miscellaneous (FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • DocketDefault Judgment (FOR POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 8270 MELROSE AVENUE, WEST HOLLYWOOD, CA. 90046 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (PLATINUM VIP COLLECTIVE, INC.; YOLIVETH ECHEVERRIA; AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (W/O PREJUDICE REQUEST TO DISMISS DOES 1 - 10 ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (RE PLATINUM VIP COLLECTIVE, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (RE YOLIVETH ECHEVERRIA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (AS TO ANY AND ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less