This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 20:55:46 (UTC).

AMEY ENTERPRISE INC VS DMCF LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/27/2015 AMEY ENTERPRISE INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DMCF LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6948

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMEY ENTERPRISE INC.

Defendants

DMCF LLC

MCCALLEN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRUCKER MICHAEL S.

Defendant Attorney

DERBY PAUL B.

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

3/27/2015: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS

3/27/2015: SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/6/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order

6/10/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/28/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGE1NT CONFE -RENCE AND /OR OSC RE. FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND/OR OSC RE. ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/28/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGE1NT CONFE -RENCE AND /OR OSC RE. FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND/OR OSC RE. ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/28/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/28/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/28/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEFENDANT DAVID MCCALLEN'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/7/2015: DEFENDANT DAVID MCCALLEN'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/11/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/12/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/12/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/12/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

8/25/2015: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/25/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL ACCOMPANYING PRE-TRIAL DATES; ETC

1/22/2016: JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ALL ACCOMPANYING PRE-TRIAL DATES; ETC

Minute Order

1/22/2016: Minute Order

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2016
  • Docketat 08:29 AM in Department 52; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (Motion to Tax Costs; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF AMEY ENTERPRISE INC.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWING AND TAKING OFF CALENDAR ITS MOTION TO STRIKE OR TEX COSTS OF DEFENDANT DAVID MC CALLEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Amey Enterprise Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by David McCallen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketDEFENDANT MCCALLEN'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF AMEY ENTERPRISE INC. TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS OF DEFENDANT DAVID MCCALLEN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS ANP AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. DRUCKER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs; Filed by Amey Enterprise Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Long Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Amey Enterprise Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGE1NT CONFE -RENCE AND /OR OSC RE. FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND/OR OSC RE. ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amey Enterprise Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less