This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 02:29:01 (UTC).

AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED VS CA HOMECARE PHARMA

Case Summary

On 03/10/2016 AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CA HOMECARE PHARMA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3428

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA HOMECARE PHARMACY

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

DEAN WESTER

WESTER ELECTRIC INC.

WESTER DEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HETTENA LAW FIRM THE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BLOCK BRANDON A. ESQ.

LAVAEE MICHAEL Y. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

3/10/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS

3/10/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/22/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/5/2016: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/12/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

7/12/2016: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED) ORDER

8/8/2016: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED) ORDER

REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

8/15/2016: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Minute Order

8/31/2016: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL Y. LAVAEE REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT

9/29/2016: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL Y. LAVAEE REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/5/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

6/7/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/9/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/10/2017: Minute Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 12; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 12; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 12; Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 12; Case Management Conference - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 12; Court Order - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2016
  • Demurrer; Filed by California Homecare Pharmacy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Wester Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Dean Wester (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Electric Company, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HOMECARE PHARMACY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA EXCEPTIONAL HOME HEALTH CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED is a litigant