This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2016 at 08:50:34 (UTC).

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE CO VS NORDIC SAUNATEC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/28/2009 AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE CO filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against NORDIC SAUNATEC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LOUIS M. MEISINGER, JAMES A. STEELE and RICHARD B WOLFE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8059

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LOUIS M. MEISINGER

JAMES A. STEELE

RICHARD B WOLFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

FIRE SAFE SYSTEMS INC. (DOE 1)

NORDIC SAUNA

SAUNATEC INC

KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS INC

FIRE SAFE SYSTEMS INC. ROE 1

TYCO FIRE SUPPRESSION & BUILDING (DOE 11)

DOES 1 TO 60

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

FIRE SAFE SYSTEMS INC. ROE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERBER BRIAN JEFFREY

Defendant Attorneys

AGAJANIAN TIM MICHAEL

MARCUCCI GERMAN

PHILLIPS DAVID MATTHEW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE - COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT SAUNATEC, INC. only ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS- COMPLAINT FILED BY SAUNATEC, INC. ON 3/23/10 ) Filed by Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2011
  • DocketReply (to opposition to motion for summary judgment ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2011
  • DocketObjection (to declaration of Alexander Graps and plaintiff's separate statement in support of opposition to motion for summary judgment ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE - CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SAUNATEC, INC. ON 3/23/10 ; 4/19/10 - AS TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. AND FIRE SAFE SYSTEMS, only ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE - CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC & FIRE SYSTEMS ON 9/23/10 ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE-CROSS-COMP FILED BY ALF TEMME dba NORDIC SAUNA ON JULY 29, 2010 - ENTIRE COMPLAINT AS TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS, INC. AND FIRE SYSTEMS, INC. ONLY) Filed by Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANTS KASABIAN DEVELOPMENTS, INC. AND FIRE SAFE SYSTEMS, INC. only ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE - complaint as to defendant TYCO FIRE SUPPRESSION & BUILDING PRODUCTS (DOE 11) ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • DocketStatement-Separate (in opposition to Saunatec, Inc.'s separate statement of undisputed material facts ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2010
  • DocketSummons-Issued (CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • DocketAnswer-Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • DocketNotice-Continuance Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • DocketNotice-Hearing on Demurrer (DEFT ALF TEMME, DBA NORDIC SAUNA'S SPECIAL DEMURRERS TO FIRST, SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLTF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Defendant in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/1980
  • DocketSummons Filed Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less