Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 12:23:58 (UTC).

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC ET AL VS AIR LEASE CORPORAT

Case Summary

On 04/24/2012 AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AIR LEASE CORPORAT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE, EMILIE H. ELIAS, JANE JOHNSON, WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, KENNETH R. FREEMAN, JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3370

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

EMILIE H. ELIAS

JANE JOHNSON

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC.

INTERNATIONAL LEASE FINANCE CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AIR LEASE CORPORATION

BAER MARC

BAI MICHAEL

CHRAIBI HOUSNI

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

GREEN EQUITY INVESTORS SIDE V LP. DOE 3

GREEN EQUITY INVESTORS V L.P

INTERNATIONAL LEASE FINANCE CORPORATION

LE JENNY VAN

LEONARD GREEN & PARTNERS LLP

LEVY GRANT

MCCARY WILLIAM

MCNITT ROBERT

PEKALA LANCE

PLUEGER JOHN

UDVAR-HAZY STEVEN

YAN CHI

Defendants and Respondents

GREEN EQUITY INVESTORS SIDE V LP. DOE 3

GREEN EQUITY INVESTORS V L.P

LEONARD GREEN & PARTNERS LLP

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP [LOS ANGELES]

MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP [SAN FRANCISCO]

QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP

DLA PIPER LLP (US)

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SCHEPER KIM & HARRIS LLP

KLAPACH & KLAPACH

MUNGER TOLLES & OLSON LLP

ABELSON MICHAEL BRUCE ESQ.

KENDALL BRILL & KLIEGER LLP

WOODS DAN ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MUNGER TOLLES & OLSON LLP

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

4/24/2012: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

SUMMONS -

4/24/2012: SUMMONS -

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

4/26/2012: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

5/3/2012: Proof of Service -

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/7/2012: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

5/7/2012: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

5/29/2012: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2015
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 308; (Motion; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Docketat 01:45 pm in Department 308, Jane Johnson, Presiding; Motion (FOR TERMINATING AND ISSUE SANCTION) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by American International Group, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Docketat 2:45 PM in Department 308; (Motion Hearing; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Docketat 02:45 pm in Department 308, Jane Johnson, Presiding; Motion Hearing (CONT. HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL) - Continued by Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Michael Bai (Defendant); Housni Chraibi (Defendant); Chi Yan (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketMotion; Filed by Michael Bai (Defendant); Housni Chraibi (Defendant); Robert McNitt (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketMotion (FOR TERMINATING AND ISSUE SANCTIONS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketDeclaration (OF DAN WOODS ISO MOTION FOR TERMINIATING AND ISSUE SANCTIONS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
618 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2012
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other ( CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL LEASE FINANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Air Lease Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Leonard Green & Partners is a litigant

Latest cases where American International Group, Inc. is a litigant