Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:36:50 (UTC).

AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORP. VS. DOMINGUEZ INV. CO., ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/03/2015 AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ INV CO . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0939

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC

SEIDNER MARC

YOUNG AVISON - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LTD

ABLE ENGINEERING SERVICES - CROSS-DEFT

GOLDEN STATE PLUMBING & HEATING - X-DEFT

MODERN AIR CONDITIONING CO. - CROSS-DEFT

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

H'S MENPOWER OFFICE INSTALLATION INC.

Cross Defendants

TRANE U.S. INC.

H'S MENPOWER OFFICE INSTALLATION INC.

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY INC.

ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS SUCCESSOR-IN-

IRON MOUNTAIN INC.

K.C.E. ELECTRIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CH2M HILL ENGINEERS INC.

S.F.T. INC.

ABM BUILDING SOLUTIONS LLC

ZOE 1 THROUGH-50 INCLUSIVE

INTEX SOLUTIONS INC.

RMI INTERNATIONAL INC.

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKR

Defendant Attorneys

ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE & MALLORY

DOLLINGER JEFFREY ALLAN

MANNING MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KIRKPATRICK CHERYL ANN

Cross Defendant Attorneys

ROSVALL ROBERT LAWRENCE

LAGMAN-LEGASPI CATHERINE CLAIRE

SOIBELMAN ADAM JEROME

NORTHRUP LINDA L.

MURRAY JAMES GARY

DIDSZUN MICHAEL DAVID

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/19/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration

11/2/2016: Declaration

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/17/2016: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Legacy Document

1/10/2017: Legacy Document

Summons

1/10/2017: Summons

Case Management Statement

1/31/2017: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document

2/22/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

3/15/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

3/16/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

3/28/2017: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

10/17/2017: Case Management Statement

Answer

11/29/2017: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/20/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/3/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/9/2018: Case Management Statement

Other -

3/19/2018: Other -

Objection

10/9/2018: Objection

Opposition

2/28/2019: Opposition

389 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • Hearingat 08:34 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Hearingat 08:32 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by K.C.E. Electric, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Cross Complaint); Filed by K.C.E. Electric, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial - Cross-Complaint); Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:34 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Adam Jerome Soibelman (Attorney); K.C.E. Electric, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial - Cross-Complaint Filed By Dominguez Investment Co., LLC on 11/03/15 as to: Trane US, Inc., only.); Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Trane U.S. Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
474 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM Building Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INTEX SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RMI INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant