This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2019 at 07:29:14 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK VS MICHAEL A CONNOLLY

Case Summary

On 11/14/2014 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL A CONNOLLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3860

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendants and Respondents

CONNELLY MICHAEL A

CONNOLLY MICHAEL ADAM

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES PC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

11/14/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. COMMON COUNTS: BOOK ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT STATED; ETC

11/14/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. COMMON COUNTS: BOOK ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT STATED; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/21/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/16/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

3/23/2015: STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order

3/23/2015: Minute Order

STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

3/23/2015: STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AND ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 664.6

10/5/2015: NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AND ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 664.6

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AND ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 664.6; NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ON MOTION; DECLARATION OF LISA D. DUBOWSKI; ETC.

10/5/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AND ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 664.6; NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ON MOTION; DECLARATION OF LISA D. DUBOWSKI; ETC.

RULING

12/7/2015: RULING

ORDER RE: MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ?664.6

12/7/2015: ORDER RE: MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ?664.6

Minute Order

12/7/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

12/18/2015: NOTICE OF RULING

ORDER FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ?664.6

9/20/2017: ORDER FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ?664.6

AMFNDED STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

9/20/2017: AMFNDED STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • ORDER FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • AMFNDED STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Stipulation; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Order; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; Hearing on Motion for Order (name extension) (Motion for an Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Stipulation; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. COMMON COUNTS: BOOK ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT STATED; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC563860    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 48

MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL AND ENTER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP § 664.6A

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank

RESPONDING PARTY(S): No opposition filed.

PROOF OF SERVICE:

ANALYSIS

There is no need to set aside the dismissal as the Court specifically retained jurisdiction to enforce the settlement pursuant to CCP § 664.6.

Plaintiff has submitted a copy of the Amended Stipulation for Conditional Entry of Judgment signed by Plaintiff and Defendant. Pursuant to the Stipulation, Defendant Michael A. Connolly was required to pay $67,502.53, inclusive of court costs, in monthly payments. Exh. A, Pages 2 - 4. Defendant has made payments in the amount of $31,077.93 toward the settlement amount agreed, but has failed to make payments on the remaining settlement balance. Decl. of Paul Eum, ¶¶ 5, 7. Defendant has failed to cure the default within 7 days of receiving the notice to cure letter. Id. at ¶ 8; Exh. C. Pursuant to the Stipulation, Plaintiff is entitled to request entry of judgment pursuant to CCP § 664.6. Id., ¶ 10; Exh. A, Page 4, ¶ 2.

The motion to enforce settlement pursuant to CCP § 664.6 is GRANTED. Judgment is to be entered in the requested sum of $31,077.93 plus $660.00.00 in costs for a total judgment of $31,737.93.