This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 06:03:00 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK VS ALBERT E BRADY

Case Summary

On 03/10/2014 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALBERT E BRADY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2204

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

BRADY ALBERT E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2015
  • Stipulation ((AMENDED) STIPULATION FOR CONDI- TIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Request (TO TAKE APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AND ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 OFF CALENDAR ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Notice of Application (FOR ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AND ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFEN- DANT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORI- TIES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Notice (OF SUBMISSION ON PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AND ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Order (FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PER CCP SECTION 664.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • Notice of Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • Stipulation (FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. (RE: ALBERT E. BRADY7 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC062204    Hearing Date: October 25, 2019    Dept: A

Calendar 13 Motion to enforce settlement CCP 664.6

THE MOTION IS GRANTED; AND

JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,323.16.