This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2019 at 17:59:33 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS CHARLES K. AN, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 09/26/2012 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHARLES K AN, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL and MASTER CALENDAR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1978

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

MASTER CALENDAR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB A FEDERAL

Defendants

AN CHARLES K.

AN CHARLES

CHARLES K

KAN CHARLES

DSH FUND LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMP.

AN CHARLES KWG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M. ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

YANG JASON PLC LAW OFFICES OF

RASLA & ASSOCIATES P.L.C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/26/2012: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

9/26/2012: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

10/17/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

10/19/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: RTN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

5/9/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

5/9/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

5/9/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GLENDA MEJIA RE: SERVICE PROCESS

5/30/2013: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GLENDA MEJIA RE: SERVICE PROCESS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/16/2014: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT ENTERED

3/10/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT ENTERED

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

2/17/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Minute Order

6/17/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/10/2015: Minute Order

Default Judgment

5/11/2018: Default Judgment

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION

5/23/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT

10/5/2018: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5))

10/30/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...)

12/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...)

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder (re: 12/05/19 Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Tentative Ruling); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Orange)); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2012
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC061978    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: SEC

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB v. AN

CASE NO.: VC061978

HEARING: 12/05/19

#7

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendant AN’s (in pro per) motion to set aside default is DENIED. (CCP § 473.5)

Opposing Party to give Notice.

Defendant argues that the default judgment should be vacated on the bases of extrinsic fraud and/or mistake.

Defendant’s Motion is denied. The judgment entered against Defendant was not entered by Default, but by a settlement stipulation that Defendant willingly entered into (pursuant to CCP §664.6). Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB and Defendant CHARLES K. AN settled this matter on or about July 28, 2015. The Written Settlement Agreement contained a CCP §664.6 clause. Defendant breached the Settlement Agreement, and on May 8, 2018, this Court granted Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB’s unopposed Motion for Order Vacating Dismissal and Entering Judgment.