This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 05:00:51 (UTC).

AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY VS. STARBUCKS CORPORATION, ET AL,

Case Summary

On 11/17/2011 AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STARBUCKS CORPORATION, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE, WILLIAM G. WILLETT, STUART M. RICE, LAURA C. ELLISON and ELIA WEINBACH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5951

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

WILLIAM G. WILLETT

STUART M. RICE

LAURA C. ELLISON

ELIA WEINBACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CHILLRITE AIR CONDITIONING INC. (DOE #1)

DOES 1 TO 25

STARBUCKS ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

STARBUCKS CORPORATION AKA STARBUCKS

STARBUCKS HOLDING COMPANY

STARBUCKS U.S. BRANDS CORPORATION

STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY

CHILLRITE AIR CONDITIONING INC. DOE #1

Not Classified By Court

POLKINGHORN WILLIAM A. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MCCARTHY & BEAVERS

Defendant Attorneys

KELLER MARIA

P.K. SCHRIEFFER LLP

 

Court Documents

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ? PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

5/20/2013: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ? PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

Minute Order -

5/29/2013: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (Court's Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • Docketat 08:34 AM in Department A; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by CHILLRITE AIR CONDITIONING, INC. (DOE #1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2012
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by STARBUCKS CORPORATION AKA STARBUCKS (Defendant); STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY (Legacy Party); STARBUCKS ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketNotice; Filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STARBUCKS HOLDING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Starbucks Coffee Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Starbucks Corp is a litigant