This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2020 at 01:50:54 (UTC).

AMBER L WUCHITECH VS HOULIHAN LOKEY CAPITAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2011 AMBER L WUCHITECH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HOULIHAN LOKEY CAPITAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2897

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WUCHITECH AMBER L.

Defendants

FRAM HOLDINGS INC.

FRAM LLC

HLHZ INVESTMENTS II LLC

HLHZ INVESTMENTS LLC

HOULIHAN LOKEY CAPITAL INC.

HOULIHAN LOKEY FINANCIAL ADVISORS INC.

HOULIHAN LOKEY HOWARD & ZUKIN CAPITAL

HOULIHAN LOKEY HOWARD & ZUKIN INC.

HOULIHAN LOKEY INC.

HOULIHAN LOKEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

HOULILAN LOKEY HOWARD & ZUKIN FINANCIAL

MISCH DAVID

HOLIHAN LOKEY EUROPE LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

NEUBAUER MARK A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SPECIAL MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES 1N SUPPORT THEREOF

3/7/2011: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SPECIAL MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES 1N SUPPORT THEREOF

APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS TO DECLARATIONS FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO CHANGE VENUE AND TO QUASH

3/7/2011: APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS TO DECLARATIONS FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO CHANGE VENUE AND TO QUASH

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

3/7/2011: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2011
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 31; (Motion to Strike; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; (OSC RE Dismissal; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc. (Defendant); Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Capital, (Defendant); Holihan Lokey (Europe) Limited (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 31; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amber L. Wuchitech (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 31; (Motion; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: I GENDE R DISCRIMLNATION(QOV. CODE 12940)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Amber L. Wuchitech (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Amber L. Wuchitech (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DEFAMATION PER SE L)EMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amber L. Wuchitech (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less