This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2021 at 09:38:48 (UTC).

AMANDA GALLEGOS VS SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/21/2013 AMANDA GALLEGOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY KEOSIAN and RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5213

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY KEOSIAN

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GALLEGOS AMANDA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 - 20

DOES 1-20

MARRIOTT INERNATIONAL INC.

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC.

SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT LESSEE INC.

SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN J. VIRAG

VIRAG BRIAN J. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

REISINGER ROBERT L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

10/21/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

10/21/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/27/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSEDI ORDER

4/9/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSEDI ORDER

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND / DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAHT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/9/2014: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND / DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAHT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/9/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT, LLC?S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDR TO DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

8/8/2014: SUNSTONE LA AIRPORT, LLC?S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDR TO DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/9/2015: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/9/2015: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MQTIONTO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

1/15/2015: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MQTIONTO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

1/15/2015: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

1/23/2015: Minute Order -

RULING RE: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

1/23/2015: RULING RE: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; (OSC RE Dismissal; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Docketat 08:33 AM in Department M; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Motion - Demurrer; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; (Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by AMANDA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by AMANDA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2014
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Marriott Inernational, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by AMANDA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by AMANDA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMANDA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunstone LA Airport LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISINGER ROBERT LEE