This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 18:55:52 (UTC).

ALYSSA MYRICKS, A MINOR, ET AL VS EVARISTO GOMEZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 ALYSSA MYRICKS, A MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EVARISTO GOMEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAW & MOTION, ROSS KLEIN, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6618

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAW & MOTION

ROSS KLEIN

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALYSSA MYRICKS A MINOR

EDWARD MYRICKS A MINOR

HARLEIGH-ANNE MYRICKS A MINOR

Defendants

(DOE 1) VERONICA ACOSTA

(ROE CORPORATION 2) E&V TRCUKING

ACOSTA VERONICA

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

E&V TRUCKING

ESCORCIA LORGIA

EVARISTO GOMEZ AN INDIVIDUAL

GOMEZ EVARISTO

GUERRERO MARTHA (DOE 3)

GUERRERO MIGUEL (DOE 2)

LORGIA ESCORGIA AN INDIVIDUAL

Minors

MYRICKS ALYSSA

MYRICKS EDWARD

MYRICKS HARLEIGH-ANNE

Guardian Ad Litems

ATHENA KORDELSKI

KORDELSKI ATHENA

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

QUIRK LAW FIRM LLP

Defendant Attorneys

QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD & BOYER P.A.

LAW OFFICES OF KURT BOYD

SCHROER MANFRED [IN BANKRUPTCY ONLY]

BOYD KURT LAW OFFICES OF

MCNEIL TROPP BRAUN & KENNEDY LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/22/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PETITION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS FROM BLOCKED ACCOUNT

5/8/2017: PETITION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS FROM BLOCKED ACCOUNT

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANCE

9/24/2013: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANCE

DEFENDANTS EVARISTO GOMEZ, MIKE & SON TRUCKING, INC., MIGUEL GUERRERO, AND MARTHA GUERRERO?S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

4/17/2013: DEFENDANTS EVARISTO GOMEZ, MIKE & SON TRUCKING, INC., MIGUEL GUERRERO, AND MARTHA GUERRERO?S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/20/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

3/12/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Unknown

4/17/2013: Unknown

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELBNEOUS)

3/4/2014: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELBNEOUS)

Unknown

4/25/2013: Unknown

NOTICE OF RULING

5/8/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM- MINOR

11/22/2013: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM- MINOR

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

3/4/2014: ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

Minute Order

2/27/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/28/2014: Minute Order

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM- MINOR

11/22/2013: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM- MINOR

PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE A RECORD UNDER SEAL & APPLICATION RE: MINORS? COMPROMISE ETC.

1/28/2014: PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE A RECORD UNDER SEAL & APPLICATION RE: MINORS? COMPROMISE ETC.

PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM

1/30/2014: PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/30/2013: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2014
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • Receipt-Deposit Funds-Blocked Acct (EDWARD MYRICKS ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • Receipt-Deposit Funds-Blocked Acct (HARLEIGH-ANNE MYRICKS ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCT ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Order (TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Order (APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (EDWARD MYRICKS)) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Order (ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDINGS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (HARLEIGH -ANNE MYRICKS)) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Order (ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT (HARLEIGH-ANNE MYRICKS) ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Ex-Parte Application (TO FILE A RECORD UNDER SEAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2012
  • Summons Filed (AMENDED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: WILFREDO SERAFIN VELASQUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: EVARISTO GOMEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Complaint Fld - No Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.