Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2020 at 05:50:39 (UTC).

ALYCE SPAHNN VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/07/2016 ALYCE SPAHNN filed an Other lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, SAMANTHA JESSNER and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6253

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

SAMANTHA JESSNER

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPAHNN ALYCE

Defendants and Respondents

SIEGEL EMILY M.D.

DANG CATHERINE M.D.

CEDARS BREAST CENTER

KULBER DAVID

FRANKEL STEVEN M.D.

COMPREHENSIVE CANCER INSTITUTE

CRANCE MEGAN R.N.

DOES 1 TO 1000

BUTTLER KAREN M.D.

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

CROSS COUNTRY HEALTHCARE INC. DOE 41

KULBER DAVID M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLICKMAN STEVEN C.

Defendant Attorneys

HIRSCHBERG MARK LAWRENCE

GONZALEZ MICHAEL DALE ESQ.

HULBERT GREGORY MORAN ESQ.

SCHWALBACH JON ROY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT, STEVEN FRANKEL, M.D.'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR

10/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT, STEVEN FRANKEL, M.D.'S NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MARCH 30, 2020) OF 03/20/2020

3/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MARCH 30, 2020) OF 03/20/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

4/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service -

1/29/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service -

Proof of Personal Service -

10/4/2018: Proof of Personal Service -

Objection - and Challenge as to Judge Yolanda Orozco Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 170.1(a)(6)(A)(ii); Declarations of Alyce Spahnn and Steven C. Glickman

10/4/2018: Objection - and Challenge as to Judge Yolanda Orozco Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 170.1(a)(6)(A)(ii); Declarations of Alyce Spahnn and Steven C. Glickman

Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continuance of Hearing of Motion for Summary Judgment

12/6/2018: Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continuance of Hearing of Motion for Summary Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO REMOVE FILIN...)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO REMOVE FILIN...)

Case Management Statement

3/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE SERVICE OF MEDICAL RECORDS OF ALYCE SPAHNN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID KULBER, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/2/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE SERVICE OF MEDICAL RECORDS OF ALYCE SPAHNN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAVID KULBER, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF COMPLETE AUTHENTICATED MEDICAL RECORDS (AMENDED)

4/3/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF COMPLETE AUTHENTICATED MEDICAL RECORDS (AMENDED)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)]

4/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)]

Request for Dismissal

5/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE 2. MEDICAL BATTERY

6/16/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE 2. MEDICAL BATTERY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

8/11/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

8/25/2017: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

9/28/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • Hearing05/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial (estimated for 10 days) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Alyce Spahnn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docketat 11:16 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: March 30, 2020)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: March 30, 2020) of 03/20/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial (estimated for 10 days) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:52 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
232 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Alyce Spahnn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint for Personal Injuries and Damages: 1. Medical Negligence 2. Medical Battery; Filed by Alyce Spahnn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Alyce Spahnn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Alyce Spahnn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alyce Spahnn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC606253    Hearing Date: March 24, 2021    Dept: 32

PLEASE NOTE: Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely.

TENTATIVE RULING

DEPARTMENT

32

HEARING DATE

March 24, 2021

CASE NUMBER

BC606253

MOTION

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

MOVING PARTY

Attorney Steven C. Glickman

OPPOSING PARTY

None

MOTION

Attorney Steven C. Glickman (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Alyce Spahnn (“Plaintiff”).

ANALYSIS

Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is the relationship between Plaintiff and Counsel has broken down. This is a proper basis for withdrawal. The Court therefore grants the motion.

The Court notes that Counsel will remain the attorney of record until Counsel files with the Court a proof of service of the signed order on Plaintiff. Counsel must serve a copy of the signed order (form MC-053) on Plaintiff within 10 days of the hearing.

Counsel is to give notice of the Court’s order and file a proof of service of such.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLICKMAN STEVEN C. ESQ.