Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 04:26:29 (UTC).

ALVARADO, DIANA M. VS HARDIN, JOHNNY R.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 ALVARADO, DIANA M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HARDIN, JOHNNY R. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4911

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALVARADO DIANA M.

Respondent

HARDIN JOHNNY R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • Request - Dismissal (With Prejudice Respondent is deceased ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alvarado, Diana ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 04-27-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (***WAIVED*** - On Behalf of: Respondent: Hardin, Johnny - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-25 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (***WAIVED*** - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alvarado, Diana - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-25 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (BY MAIL FL-100, FL-110, FL120 FL-160 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alvarado, Diana ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (ORIGINAL CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT IS ON THIS PROOF FL-100, FL-110, FL-120 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Notice - Rejection (PROOF OF SUMMONS FL-115 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 12-01-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alvarado, Diana - Filed and Entered on 2016-10-12 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Declaration (SEPARATE PROPERTY - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Alvarado, Diana - Filed and Entered on 2016-10-12 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less