This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2023 at 14:47:04 (UTC).

ALON ELIAS VS. ISSACHAR SHABTAY

Case Summary

On 12/24/2015 ALON ELIAS filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against ISSACHAR SHABTAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4843

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ELIAS ALON

SHABTAY ISSACHAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOUNDS KENNETH CHARLES

CROCKETT WILLIAM EDWIN

STEINBERG JODY

WILLIAM E. CROCKETT LAW OFFICES OF

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SOL LEVITT ESQ.

HANGER STEINBERG SHAPIRO & ASH

TAKAGI TAWNI LEE

PARTIDA GUILLERMO ENGELBERT

Other Attorneys

TWANI L. TAKAGI LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST; STAT...)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST; STAT...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

10/7/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF PARTIES; DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT

1/11/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF PARTIES; DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST; STAT...)

1/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST; STAT...)

Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/13/2021: Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Request for Dismissal

3/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY; 2) TRIAL SETTIN...)

11/20/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY; 2) TRIAL SETTIN...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...) OF 07/08/2019

7/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...) OF 07/08/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...)

7/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE 1) STAY ON BANKRUPTCY FILING; AND 2) APP...) OF 09/13/2019

9/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE 1) STAY ON BANKRUPTCY FILING; AND 2) APP...) OF 09/13/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER SETTING A STATUS CONFE...) OF 09/13/2019

9/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER SETTING A STATUS CONFE...) OF 09/13/2019

Order - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE, MABEL HAYEK, CSR NO.11815 9/13/2019 HEARING DEPARTMENT D

9/13/2019: Order - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE, MABEL HAYEK, CSR NO.11815 9/13/2019 HEARING DEPARTMENT D

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER SETTING A STATUS CONFE...)

9/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW COURT ORDER SETTING A STATUS CONFE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE 1) STAY ON BANKRUPTCY FILING; AND 2) APP...)

9/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE 1) STAY ON BANKRUPTCY FILING; AND 2) APP...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE 1) STAY ON BANKRUPTCY FILING; AND 2) APP...)

10/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE 1) STAY ON BANKRUPTCY FILING; AND 2) APP...)

Substitution of Attorney

10/23/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

12/19/2019: Answer

Brief - BRIEF STATUS CONFERENCE BRIEF

1/15/2020: Brief - BRIEF STATUS CONFERENCE BRIEF

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ALON ELIAS on 12/24/2015, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ALON ELIAS as to ISSACHAR SHABTAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why the Answer of Defendant Issachar Shabtay Should Not Be Stricken scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference This Case Only scheduled for 08/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketJury Trial This Case Only scheduled for 08/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why the Answer of Defendant Issachar Shabtay Should Not Be Stricken scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference This Case Only scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/12/2021 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial This Case Only scheduled for 02/22/2021 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/23/2021 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Signed and Filed by: ISSACHAR SHABTAY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
286 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketDocument:Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketDocument:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Defamation (Slander/Libel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketSpecial Status Start:Individual Calendar Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Defamation (Slander/Libel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketCalendaring:Conference-Case Management 07/19/16 at 8:31 am Donna Fields Goldstein

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less