This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 04:07:00 (UTC).

ALMA VANESSA CASILLAS ET AL VS WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS WFS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/10/2016 ALMA VANESSA CASILLAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS WFS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9524

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FLORES CHRISTOPHER

OCEGUEDA ROSE FAMILY

AYON KARINA

CASILLAS ALMA VANESSA

OSEGUEDA ROSE EMILY

Defendants and Respondents

WFE MANAGEMENT INC.

WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS WFS LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

WORKFORCE ENTERPRISES WFE INC.

Cross Defendant

CHANGING LIVES STAFFING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PAIRAVI LAW P.C.

PAIRAVI EDWIN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GORDON & REES LLP

BIGGINS CHAD

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHAD BIGGINS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT

1/19/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHAD BIGGINS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR COMPLIANCE WITH PRIOR COURT ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

2/5/2018: PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR COMPLIANCE WITH PRIOR COURT ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

CROSS COMPLAINT FOR

3/26/2018: CROSS COMPLAINT FOR

STIPULATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

6/29/2018: STIPULATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

6/29/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/13/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

9/17/2018: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Motion in Limine

11/8/2018: Motion in Limine

Declaration

3/26/2019: Declaration

Motion to Disqualify Counsel

4/19/2019: Motion to Disqualify Counsel

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/23/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order

6/15/2017: Minute Order

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED ITEMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT WFE MANAGEMENT, INC. TO PROVIDE OBJECTION FREE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

9/13/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED ITEMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT WFE MANAGEMENT, INC. TO PROVIDE OBJECTION FREE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

Minute Order

9/14/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY S

10/16/2017: DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY S

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

10/30/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

11/28/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Disqualify Counsel); Filed by Workforce Solutions WFS, LLC (Defendant); WFE Management, Inc. (Defendant); Workforce Enterprises Wfe, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Andrew Hernandez); Filed by Workforce Solutions WFS, LLC (Defendant); WFE Management, Inc. (Defendant); Workforce Enterprises Wfe, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Filed by Alma Vanessa Casillas (Plaintiff); Christopher Flores (Plaintiff); Karina Ayon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice (of Continuance); Filed by Alma Vanessa Casillas (Plaintiff); Christopher Flores (Plaintiff); Karina Ayon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (CSR: Ronald L. Cook/ #13928); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS? PMK; RESET THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND EXPEDITE A RULING ON PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS); Filed by Alma Vanessa Casillas (Plaintiff); Christopher Flores (Plaintiff); Karina Ayon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS? PMK; RESET THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND EXPEDITE A RULING ON PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF D...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte for 3-28-19); Filed by Workforce Solutions WFS, LLC (Defendant); WFE Management, Inc. (Defendant); Workforce Enterprises Wfe, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
265 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Alma Vanessa Casillas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Alma Vanessa Casillas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY ALL WAGES UPON SEPARATION UNDER ILABOR CODE 203]; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Alma Vanessa Casillas (Plaintiff); Christopher Flores (Plaintiff); Karina Ayon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC619524    Hearing Date: July 01, 2020    Dept: 49

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Alma Vanessa Casillas, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

Case No.

BC619524

v.

[Tentative] Ruling

Workforce Solutions WFS, LLC, et al.

Defendants.

Hearing Date: July 1, 2020

Department 49, Judge Stuart M. Rice

(1) Motion for Attorney Fees

Moving Party:  Plaintiffs/Cross-Defendants Alma Vanessa Casillas, Karina Ayon, and Changing Lives Staffing

Responding Party:      Defendants Workforce Solutions WFS, LLC, WFE Management, Inc., Workforce Enterprises, WFE, Inc.

Ruling: Plaintiffs’ motion for attorney fees and costs is granted in the amount of $716,366.50, which includes $650,283 in attorney fees and $66,083.50 in costs.

Costs

Conclusion

Date: July 1, 2020

Honorable Stuart M. Rice

Judge of the Superior Court