This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:21:37 (UTC).

ALMA CORTES VS MANUEL I REYNOSO ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/04/2016 ALMA CORTES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MANUEL I REYNOSO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9427

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTES ALMA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

REYNOSO MANUEL I

M.I.R.R. FOODS INC

REYNOSO EVANGILINA

REY FOODS INC

REY AND REY FOODS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHELDON PHILIP RAYMOND ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

VERDI ALFRED JOSEPH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/12/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DECLARATION OF PHILIP R. SHELDON IN SUPPORT OF A REQUEST FOR A SHORT TRIAL CONTINUANCE

5/14/2018: DECLARATION OF PHILIP R. SHELDON IN SUPPORT OF A REQUEST FOR A SHORT TRIAL CONTINUANCE

DEFENDANTS TRIAL BRIEF

5/15/2018: DEFENDANTS TRIAL BRIEF

Minute Order

5/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/11/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

3/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

3/21/2019: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

8/4/2016: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/8/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REDEMPTION/REMITTANCE NOTICE

9/14/2016: REDEMPTION/REMITTANCE NOTICE

Minute Order

1/3/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/23/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/15/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

6/5/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

6/26/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

Unknown

7/26/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

9/22/2017: Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial (( 1 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Alma Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by Alma Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Status Conference (re Status of Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Alma Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial (( 1 day estimate)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial ( 1 day estimate))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial ( 1 day estimate)) of 02/11/2019 and 10/30/18 and 12/7/18 minute orders); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • REDEMPTION/REMITTANCE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • CHECK ALERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Alma Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC629427    Hearing Date: October 14, 2020    Dept: 26

Plaintiff Alma Cortes’s unopposed Motion to Enter Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation for Entry of Judgment is GRANTED.

On December 12, 2019, the parties entered into a handwritten conditional settlement agreement and filed notice with the court as such on December 13, 2019. (Motion, Ex. A.) On February 11, 2020, the parties drafted and executed a typed version. (Motion, Ex. B.) In both agreements the parties stipulated for the court to retain jurisdiction to enforce the parties’ settlement agreement pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6. Thus, the Court has the authority to enforce the settlement agreement entered into between the parties per CCP § 664.6. Defendants Manuel Reynoso, M.I.R.R. Foods, Inc., and Rey and Rey Foods, Inc. (collectively “Defendants”) have failed to timely pay Plaintiff any of the amounts due under the settlement and therefore is in default on the terms of the settlement agreement. (See Cortes Decl. p.1:23.) In the settlement agreement, Defendants stipulated to entry of judgment upon Defendants’ default in payments and without further notice upon 15-days of nonpayment. (Motion Ex. B.) Defendants waived the right to any further notice or hearing. Plaintiff has provided the required notice of default in payments and notice of intent to request entry of judgment.

However, to the extent that Plaintiff seeks prejudgment interest, (Motion p.5:12-13), the request is denied. The stipulated judgment amount does not provide for prejudgment interest.

Judgment is entered in Plaintiff’s favor against Defendants Manuel Reynoso, M.I.R.R. Foods, Inc., and Rey and Rey Foods, Inc. in the principal amount of $60,000.00 (stipulated judgment of $60,000.00 less credit for $0 paid). Within ten days, Moving Party is to file and serve a proposed judgment on form JUD-100 consistent with the above

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REY AND REY FOODS INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION DBA CAPORAL FOODS is a litigant

Latest cases where M.I.R.R. FOODS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA CAPORAL FOODS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHELDON PHILIP RAYMOND