This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 02:08:18 (UTC).

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY VS JOBE ROOFING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/19/2015 ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOBE ROOFING COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3020

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

JOBE ROOFING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CULBRETH SCHROEDER LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/19/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/19/2015: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

SUMMONS

2/19/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/6/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/5/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT ACCELERATED WATERPROOFING, INC.

11/4/2015: NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT ACCELERATED WATERPROOFING, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT ACCELERATED WATERPROOFING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOBE ROOFING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant