This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 02:05:59 (UTC).

ALLISON SMITH VS MIRANDA AUTO SALES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2015 ALLISON SMITH filed an Other lawsuit against MIRANDA AUTO SALES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7875

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SMITH ALLISON

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

HOUSE OF FINANCE CORP.

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

MIRANDA AUTO SALES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAMONICA & FOLEY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

7/13/2015: COMPLAINT

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

7/14/2015: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

SUMMONS

7/20/2015: SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/18/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/30/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2015
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Allison Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Allison Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Allison Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Allison Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSE OF FINANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where MIRANDA'S AUTO is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant