This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2016 at 23:44:40 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED PARKING SYSTEMS LLC VS FEED BODY & SOUL ET A

Case Summary

On 06/11/2014 ALLIANCE UNITED PARKING SYSTEMS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FEED BODY SOUL ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8217

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALLIANCE UNITED PARKING SYSTEMS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

FEED BODY & SOUL

FEED BODY & SOUL RESTAURANT

STAATS ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ALAN M. HORWITZ

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WILNER ALAN D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

6/11/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, BREACH OF CONTRACT, INTENTIONAL, INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS, INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTIVE ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE, INDUCING BREACH OF CONTRACT

6/11/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, BREACH OF CONTRACT, INTENTIONAL, INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS, INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTIVE ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE, INDUCING BREACH OF CONTRACT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/24/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/28/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/28/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

8/4/2014: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND APPEAR AT CMC ON 10/09/14

10/17/2014: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND APPEAR AT CMC ON 10/09/14

Unknown

10/17/2014: Unknown

PLAINTIFF REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND APPEAR AT CMC ON 10/09/14

11/3/2014: PLAINTIFF REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND APPEAR AT CMC ON 10/09/14

Unknown

11/3/2014: Unknown

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: SANCTIONS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/10/2014: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: SANCTIONS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

11/10/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/11/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTING OF COURT TRIAL

12/16/2014: NOTICE OF SETTING OF COURT TRIAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/17/2015: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

4/27/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/5/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/5/2015: Minute Order

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2015
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (***ENTIRE ACTION W/ PREJUDICE*** ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • Response (PLTFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Notice (OF SETTING OF COURT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • Notice of Continuance (OF OSC RE SANCTIONS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Reply/Response (pltffs reply to order to show cause case management conference statement and appear ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • Reply/Response ( defdts reply to order to show cause re sanctions for failure to file case management statement and appear at cmc on 10/09/14) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Proof of Service (re summons and complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED PARKING SYSTMES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILNER ESQ. ALAN D.