This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 16:26:06 (UTC).

A.L.L. ROOFING & BUILDING VS. BUILT-RITE ROOFING, ET. AL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2013 A L L ROOFING BUILDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BUILT-RITE ROOFING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7620

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A.L.L. ROOFING & BUILDING MATERIALS

Defendants

ATKINSON KEVIN

BUILT

KLINGMAN STEVEN

BUILT-RITE ROOFING INC.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLAKELEY & BLAKELEY LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/05/2013

DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2013

DocketNotice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2013

DocketMiscellaneous-Other (amended declaration of Yvonne Lidster in support of application ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2013

DocketProof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2013

DocketMiscellaneous-Other (AMENDED MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORI- TIES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2013

DocketAmended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2013

DocketProof of Service (re amended complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

DocketMiscellaneous-Other (MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATIONS FOR A WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

DocketProof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

DocketApplication - misc (AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER & WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

DocketApplication - misc Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

DocketDeclaration (of Yvonne Lidster in support of applicaitons for writs of attachment ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2013

DocketComplaint Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2013

DocketSummons Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less