This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2016 at 04:39:53 (UTC).

ALICIA M. TRIPI VS RYAN ROGERS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2012 ALICIA M TRIPI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RYAN ROGERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. MILTON, ADR NEUTRAL, GAIL FEUER, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8330

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. MILTON

ADR NEUTRAL

GAIL FEUER

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRIPI ALICIA M.

Defendants

ROGERS RYAN

RYAN MICHAEL

CITY OF BURBANK

JOHNSON ERICK

Others

GOLDHAMMER HARVEY L. ESQ.

STOCKALPER PATRICK

Not Classified By Court

WASMUND H. ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON JEROME M.

Defendant Attorneys

SAFRAN NEAL R. ATTORNEY AT LAW

LAW OFFICE OF BEVERLY I. MILLS

MARCUS GERALD L.

EARLY MASLACH & HARTSUYKER

BARLOW DENNIS A. CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/24/2013: Minute Order

RYAN ROGERS ANSWER TO CROSSCOMI?LAIN?I OF? THE CITY OF BURBANK

9/11/2013: RYAN ROGERS ANSWER TO CROSSCOMI?LAIN?I OF? THE CITY OF BURBANK

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIALS FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF CITY OF BURBANK?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/17/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIALS FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF CITY OF BURBANK?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SHORTEN TIME FOR THE HEARING OF A NOTICED MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF KATHLEE

12/24/2013: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SHORTEN TIME FOR THE HEARING OF A NOTICED MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF KATHLEE

EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANK?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/17/2013: EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANK?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF ERICK JOHNSON

9/17/2013: DECLARATION OF ERICK JOHNSON

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT

3/27/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO P1 COURT

Minute Order

8/29/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

12/26/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

ORDER GRANTING EX 4SE APPLICATION CONFIRMING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OR SETHNG MATTER FOR HEARING AS A NOTICED MOTION ON SHORTENED NOTICE

12/24/2013: ORDER GRANTING EX 4SE APPLICATION CONFIRMING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OR SETHNG MATTER FOR HEARING AS A NOTICED MOTION ON SHORTENED NOTICE

Minute Order

1/2/2014: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF KENNETH JOHNSON

9/17/2013: DECLARATION OF KENNETH JOHNSON

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/21/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

12/2/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Minute Order

12/6/2013: Minute Order

DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANK?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON THE ISSUES OF DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY, CAUSATION AND TRAFF

9/17/2013: DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANK?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON THE ISSUES OF DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY, CAUSATION AND TRAFF

Minute Order

6/4/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENC AND JURY TRIAL

6/7/2013: NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENC AND JURY TRIAL

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT FILED BY MICHAEL RYAN AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2013
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/X-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Ex-Parte Application (RE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Order Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (ALL PARTIES HAVE NOT SIGNED DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr Filed by Attorney for Defendant/X-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO: CITY OF BURBANK & ERICK JOHNSON ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • Statement of Facts Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • Declaration Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2012
  • Answer (TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • Summons Filed (CROSS COMPLT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • Answer (TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) (COURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.