This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:37:35 (UTC).

ALICIA ARIAS VS SAN ANDRES MEDICAL CLINIC INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/19/2016 ALICIA ARIAS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SAN ANDRES MEDICAL CLINIC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0997

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARIAS ALICIA

Defendants and Respondents

HADDAD NAZIH M. M.D.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

SAN ANDRES MEDICAL CLINIC INC.

BURBIA JAVIER P.A. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ROMERO LAW APC

ROMERO ALAN JAMES

Defendant Attorney

REINHOLTZ JACK RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/3/2018: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, TRIAL DATE, MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES PURSUANT TO C.R.C. 3.1332(B); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; ETC.

1/3/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, TRIAL DATE, MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES PURSUANT TO C.R.C. 3.1332(B); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; ETC.

NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE HEARING TO CONTINUE HEARING DATES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL DATES

1/23/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE HEARING TO CONTINUE HEARING DATES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL DATES

Minute Order

2/27/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT NAZIH M. HADDAD, M.D.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/28/2018: DEFENDANT NAZIH M. HADDAD, M.D.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order

3/7/2018: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/10/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DEFENDANT NAZIH M. HADDAD, M.D. AND PLAINTIFF ALICIA ARIAS

7/23/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DEFENDANT NAZIH M. HADDAD, M.D. AND PLAINTIFF ALICIA ARIAS

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT;AND ETC.

7/24/2018: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT;AND ETC.

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NAZIH M. HADDAD, M.D.?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/30/2018: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NAZIH M. HADDAD, M.D.?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order

8/21/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/19/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

2/19/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/24/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

8/21/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

11/7/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING BY THE COURT OF DEFENDANT NAZIH M. HADDAD, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING BY THE COURT OF DEFENDANT NAZIH M. HADDAD, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Enter Default Jugment as to Defendants Javier Burbia and San Andres Medical Clinic, Inc.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Enter Defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Enter Default Jugment as to Defendants Javier Burbia and San Andres Medical Clinic, Inc.) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Enter Defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause); Filed by Alicia Arias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Enter Default Jugment as to Defendants Javier Burbia an dSan Andres Medical Clinic, Inc.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Enter Defaul...) of 02/19/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Enter Defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Alicia Arias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Alicia Arias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Receipt; Filed by Alicia Arias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Alicia Arias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC610997    Hearing Date: February 24, 2021    Dept: 28

Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows. been filed.

On December 2, 2020, the Court stayed a hearing and application for order and appearance and examination after counsel reported Judgment Debtor San Andres Medical Clinic, Inc. had filed for bankruptcy.

The Court finds this entire action must be stayed pending resolution of the bankruptcy proceeding.  (See Traweek v. Finley, Kumble, etc. Myerson & Casey (1991) 235 Cal.App.3d 1128, 1135; see also Rim Forest Lumbar Co. v. Woodside Construction Co. (1987) 190 Cal.App.3d 454, 469.)

The hearing on this motion is CONTINUED to May 5, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. to be heard in conjunction with the Status Conference Re: the Status of the bankruptcy of Defendant San Andres Medical Clinic, Inc.

Judgment Creditor Alicia Arias is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Judgment Creditor Alicia Arias is ordered to file a proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.