This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:00:30 (UTC).

ALI NAMAZIE, M.D. VS. TODD M. REZNIK, CPA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/30/2015 ALI NAMAZIE, M D filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against TODD M REZNIK, CPA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3228

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A MEDICAL GROUP INC.

ALI NAMAZIE M.D.

ALI R. NAMAZIE M.D.

Defendants

BROWN STERMAN REZNIK & GERSHKOWITZ A

DOES 1-100

PATTANAIK LALAT

ROES 101-200

TODD M. REZNIK CPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALTON L. RICH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Request-Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Request-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by M.D. Ali Namazie (Plaintiff); M.D. Ali R. Namazie (Plaintiff); A Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Summons; Filed by M.D. Ali Namazie (Plaintiff); M.D. Ali R. Namazie (Plaintiff); A Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by M.D. Ali Namazie (Plaintiff); M.D. Ali R. Namazie (Plaintiff); A Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant