This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 23:24:13 (UTC).

ALFREDO REVELES VS. MARK CHRISTOPHER GATMAITAN

Case Summary

On 07/28/2015 ALFREDO REVELES filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MARK CHRISTOPHER GATMAITAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4228

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

REVELES ALFREDO

REVELES MICHELE

SCOTT EVELYN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ARGENT SECURITIES INC.

GATMAITAN MARIA MARGARITA

GATMAITAN MARK CHRISTOPHER

GAIMAITAN MEGAN GRACE DOE 1

GATMAITAN MEGAN F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SHOSHANA F. KARPELES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Alfredo Reveles (Legacy Party); Michele Reveles (Legacy Party); Evelyn Scott (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Mark Christopher Gatmaitan (Legacy Party); Maria Margarita Gatmaitan (Legacy Party); Argent Securities, Inc. (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by Mark Christopher Gatmaitan (Legacy Party); Maria Margarita Gatmaitan (Legacy Party); Gaimaitan, Megan Grace (Doe 1) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • at 10:30 AM in Department A; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Long Cause; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order (Court Order; Trial continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • First Amended Cross-Complaint; Filed by Mark Christopher Gatmaitan (Legacy Party); Maria Margarita Gatmaitan (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • at 10:30 AM in Department A; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Trial continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2015
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Alfredo Reveles (Legacy Party); Michele Reveles (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • at 1:30 PM in Department A; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Alfredo Reveles (Legacy Party); Michele Reveles (Legacy Party); Evelyn Scott (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Alfredo Reveles (Legacy Party); Michele Reveles (Legacy Party); Evelyn Scott (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Alfredo Reveles (Legacy Party); Michele Reveles (Legacy Party); Evelyn Scott (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Default Entered; Filed by Alfredo Reveles (Legacy Party); Michele Reveles (Legacy Party); Evelyn Scott (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less