This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 11:15:09 (UTC).

ALFREDO GALVAN VS. FLEETWOOD RV

Case Summary

On 10/28/2016 ALFREDO GALVAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FLEETWOOD RV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and JOHN A. TORRIBIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5897

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

JOHN A. TORRIBIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALVAN ALFREDO

GALVAN KHLOE BY AND THROUGH HER

GALVAN KRISTEN

Defendants

FLEETWOOD RV

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

FLEETWOOD RV INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS

MIKE THOMPSON RV 3

LIPPERT COMPONENTS INC.

FLEETWOOD RV INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS

RV FLEETWOOD

Guardian Ad Litem

KRISTEN GALVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUTCHENS LAWRENCE

KANAREK MARTIN JOEL

Defendant Attorneys

SALCIDO RICHARD

SUTTON & MURPHY

MURPHY THOMAS MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

6/13/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Substitution of Attorney

6/14/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

2/4/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

3/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Other - - Other - Proof of Service

12/27/2016: Other - - Other - Proof of Service

Demand for Jury Trial

12/29/2016: Demand for Jury Trial

Case Management Statement

3/30/2017: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

3/30/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

Case Management Statement

4/14/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-10-26 00:00:00

10/26/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-10-26 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Second Amended Complaint

4/19/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Second Amended Complaint

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

6/28/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

Order -

9/26/2018: Order -

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer Plaintiffs' Request for Punitive Damages from Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint

11/9/2018: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer Plaintiffs' Request for Punitive Damages from Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint

Order - Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference, Final Status Conference, and Trial Dates

12/4/2018: Order - Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference, Final Status Conference, and Trial Dates

Answer - Answer To Third Amended Complaint

12/4/2018: Answer - Answer To Third Amended Complaint

Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order re third amended complaint

12/10/2018: Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order re third amended complaint

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/16/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FLEETWOOD RV, INC. (erroneously sued as (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order regarding advancing and continuing hearing set fo...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order regarding advancing and continuing hearing set fo...) of 04/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department G, John A. Torribio, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by KRISTEN GALVAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim; Filed by KRISTEN GALVAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketOther - (Proof of Service); Filed by ALFREDO GALVAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/21/16 AS TO THOMPSON RV 3 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by ALFREDO GALVAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALFREDO GALVAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REV RECREATION GROUP INC. DBA FLEETWOOD RV A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY THOMAS MATTHEW