This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2019 at 20:01:45 (UTC).

ALFRED GONZALEZ VS. PAUL CARLSON

Case Summary

On 06/06/2014 ALFRED GONZALEZ filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against PAUL CARLSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN J. GOODMAN and NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2659

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ ALFRED

Defendant

CARLSON PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BUCKWALTER PHILIP LINCOLN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; (Order to Show Cause; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (re sanctions on plantiff) - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (FOR STATUS OF TRANSFER TO SANTACRUZ SUPERIOR COURT;) - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; (Order to Show Cause; OSC held & order is made) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE STATUS OF TRANSFER TOSANTA CRUZ COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT) - OSC held & order is made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion for Order (name extension) (Motion for an Order; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2014
  • Request (FOR DISCOVERY CONFERENCE; **DENIED** ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • Request; Filed by ALFRED GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver (AS TO ALFRED GONZALEZ ); Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Request-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by ALFRED GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Summons; Filed by ALFRED GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); ALFRED GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by ALFRED GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); ALFRED GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less