This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2020 at 22:38:10 (UTC).

ALEXANDRIA SQUARE LLC VS BOO JA OH

Case Summary

On 01/29/2009 ALEXANDRIA SQUARE LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BOO JA OH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ABRAHAM KHAN and IRVING FEFFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6588

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ABRAHAM KHAN

IRVING FEFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALEXANDRIA SQUARE LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

OH BOO JA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSENTHAL LISA F. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • Docketat 08:36 am in Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed - Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • DocketJudgment (-signed by Judge Khan- ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • DocketMemo of Costs ((SUMMARY) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs ($1,950.00 T/D JUDGMENT HAS NOT BEEN ENTERED IN THIS ACTION MEMO TO SCANNING 4/14/09 MAIL NOT. 4/14/09 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Court Trial - Short Cause (UD TRIAL- 20 MINS;) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 51, Irving Feffer, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketDefault Entered (ALL ADULT OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (ALL PERSONS WHO MAY CLAIM TO OCCUPY THE PREMISES AT THE TIME OF THE FILING ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (UNDER CCP 415.46 PARTY SERVED ALL PERSONS WHO MAY CLAIM TO OCCUPY THE PREMISES AT THE TIME OF THE ACTION. PARTY IN 2B ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketRequest (FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default (REJECT FOR OH- ANSWER FILED ON 2-17-09 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • DocketAnswer (UNLAWFUL DETAINER ); Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALEXANDRIA SQUARE LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F