This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 00:17:41 (UTC).

ALEXANDRIA SQUARE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS ALEXANDRIA SQUAR

Case Summary

On 07/02/2012 ALEXANDRIA SQUARE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against ALEXANDRIA SQUAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EMILIE H. ELIAS, KENNETH R. FREEMAN and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7680

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EMILIE H. ELIAS

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALEXANDRIA SQUARE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Respondents

ALEXANDRIA SQUARE LLC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOLDINGS II LLC.

SWIFT CONSTRUCTION INC.

ACTUAL ROOFING CO.

BARRAZA & SONS HEAVY EQUIPMENTS INC.

BCS CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC.

DENNIS BAKKENSON - DOE 210

DOES 1 THROUGH 1000

EXCEL PLASTERING INC. (DOE 228)

EXCEL PLASTERING INC. - ROE 24

Cross Defendants

ACETECH CONSTRUCTION INC. ROE 1

ALARM ENGINEERS ROE 2

BARRAZA & SONS INC. ROE 3

BROTHER'S LEAL IRON WORKS ROE 4

CAPITAL CABINET CORP INC. ROE 5

DAN JOHNSON CUSTOM PAINTING ROE 7

E & N DRYWAL CONSTRUCTION INC. ROE 8

ERIE WATERPROOFING SYSTEM ROE 12

EXCEL PLASTERING INC. - ROE 24

GOLDEN STATE FIRE INC. ROE 9

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JACKSON LEE ESQ.

MILSTEIN ADELMAN LLOP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

HAMMONS WALLACE W. ESQ.

LAWRENCE W. CHAMBLEE

MINOOFAR PEDRAM

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

PERRY E. RHOADS ESQ.

ROBERT SMYLIE & ASSOCIATES

SMYLIE & LEVEN

TIMOTHY P. DAILEY ESQ.

WARSHAW ADAM S. ESQ.

DASOVICH CAROLINE L. ESQ.

SATALINO FRANK ESQ.

EARLY MASLACH & HARTSUYKER

HANGER STEINBERG SHAPIRO & ASH ALC

SILVER GERALD N. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DASOVICH CAROLINE L. ESQ.

SATALINO FRANK ESQ.

EARLY MASLACH & HARTSUYKER

HANGER STEINBERG SHAPIRO & ASH ALC

SILVER GERALD N. ESQ.

KLAPPERMAN WILLIAM A. ESQ.

SILVER CRAIG J THE LAW OFFICE OF

WOODS & YOO PC

 

Court Documents

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOLDINGS II, LLC FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT, WARRANTY 2) BREACH OF CONTRACT, INSURANCE 3) BREACH OF CONTRACT, INDEMNITY 4) NEGLIGENCE 5) STRICT LIABILITY 6) EXPR

8/3/2012: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOLDINGS II, LLC FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT, WARRANTY 2) BREACH OF CONTRACT, INSURANCE 3) BREACH OF CONTRACT, INDEMNITY 4) NEGLIGENCE 5) STRICT LIABILITY 6) EXPR

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/6/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSSCOMPLAINT NAMING ROE 12, P. ERIE WATERPROOFING SYSTEM

8/20/2012: ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSSCOMPLAINT NAMING ROE 12, P. ERIE WATERPROOFING SYSTEM

ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSSCOMPLAINT NAMING ROE 13, PARAGON SCHMID BUILDING PRODUCTS

8/20/2012: ROE AMENDMENT TO CROSSCOMPLAINT NAMING ROE 13, PARAGON SCHMID BUILDING PRODUCTS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/24/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS -

10/26/2012: SUMMONS -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

11/21/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

12/3/2012: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

12/3/2012: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION TO SERVE SEC'Y OF STATE

12/6/2012: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION TO SERVE SEC'Y OF STATE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/1/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

2/15/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/25/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/25/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/28/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

4/10/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

JOINT STATUS REPORT

4/23/2013: JOINT STATUS REPORT

PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DEEMING CASE COMPLEX PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT RULE 3.400 AND TRANSFERRING THE CASE TO THE CENTRAL CIVIL WEST COURT; ETC.

6/5/2013: PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DEEMING CASE COMPLEX PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT RULE 3.400 AND TRANSFERRING THE CASE TO THE CENTRAL CIVIL WEST COURT; ETC.

253 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 310; Status Conference (Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketCase File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketCase File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Custom Design Roofing (Cross-Complainant); Southern California Holdings II, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alexandria Square Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 310; Status Conference (Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Southern California Holdings II, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 23; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT MAPCO CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MANDATORY SETIELEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
545 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketSOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOLDINGS II, LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Southern California Holdings II, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Southern California Holdings II, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOLDINGS II, LLC FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT, WARRANTY 2) BREACH OF CONTRACT, INSURANCE 3) BREACH OF CONTRACT, INDEMNITY 4) NEGLIGENCE 5) STRICT LIABILITY 6) EXPRESS INDEMNITY 7) IMPLIED INDEMNITY 8) EQUITABLE INDEMNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alexandria Square Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF BUILDING STANDARDS AS SET FORTH IN CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 896; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALEXANDRIA SQUARE LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIQUE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BARRAZA & SONS HEAVY EQUIPMENTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant