This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2021 at 11:55:10 (UTC).

ALEXANDER VILLAR VS. DUGALLY OBERFELD INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2012 ALEXANDER VILLAR filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against DUGALLY OBERFELD INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN P. PFAHLER and RANDY RHODES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2398

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

VILLAR ALEXANDER

VILLAR RHONDA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALECK DUGALLY CO. LLC.

DUGALLY OBERFELD INC.

JONES ROOFING INC.

MANDAC INC.

OKLAND CONSTRUCTION INC.

SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC.

JONES ROOFING INC

SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC

WATERPROOFING EXPERTS INC. DBA NATIONAL

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VILLAR ALEXANDER

VILLAR RHONDA

ALECK DUGALLY CO. LLC.

DUGALLY OBERFELD INC.

JONES ROOFING INC.

MANDAC INC.

OKLAND CONSTRUCTION INC.

SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC.

B&M CONTRACTORS (ROE 1)......

DUGALLY OBERFELD LLC

LIPTON & SONS AS ROE 3

M&M SHEET METAL & RAINGUTTERS (ROE 4)...

MANDAC INC. DBA CERTIFIED SERVICE ROE 2

MOES 1-100

STEVEN FOSTER PLASTER (ROE 5).....

WATERPROOFING EXPERTS INC. DBA NATIONAL

JONES ROOFING INC

STEVEN FOSTER PLASTER (ROE 5)

SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC

Other

CHARLES L. HARRIS

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DRESCHER ROBERT E.

ROBERT D. DRESCHER/VEATCH CARLSON LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

COOKSEY TOOLEN GAGE DUFFY & WOOG

COOLEY MANION JONES LLP

GRAY & DUFFY

JACOBS & DODDS

LEE TED M.

MCCLUSKEY & MONTGOMERY LLP

WATERS MCCLUSKEY & BOEHLE

Cross Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by OKLAND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC. (DISMISSED) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ALEXANDER VILLAR (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by RHONDA VILLAR (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; Dismissed - Misc.) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC. (DISMISSED) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by OKLAND CONSTRUCTION INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Docketat 08:33 AM in Department F49; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC. (DISMISSED) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
503 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer; Filed by ALECK DUGALLY CO. LLC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by ALECK DUGALLY CO. LLC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by ALECK DUGALLY CO. LLC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department F50; (Request for Dismissal; ENTERED) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • DocketPartial Dismissal; Filed by ALEXANDER VILLAR (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SUNLAND WOOD PRODUCTS INC. (DISMISSED) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ALEXANDER VILLAR (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ALEXANDER VILLAR (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANDAC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where B&M CONTRACTORS (ROE 1)...... is a litigant

Latest cases where Sunland Wood Products, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant