This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 02:17:29 (UTC).

ALEXANDER PALAFOX VS MARIA DEL ROSARIO ESTRADA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/17/2016 ALEXANDER PALAFOX filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA DEL ROSARIO ESTRADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0820

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALAFOX ALEXANDRA

Defendants and Respondents

ESTRADA MARIA DEL ROSARIO

CRUZ SANTIGO HIGINIO

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SANDERS MARSHALL C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

REEVES SHERYL LEE ESQ.

MARTIN MICHAEL G. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO ATTEND TRIAL

12/20/2017: NOTICE TO ATTEND TRIAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

2/21/2018: [ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

DEFENDANT'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDING AND VACATE FSC AND TRIAL DATES; DECLARATION OF SCOTT E. BRAYBROOKE;

4/5/2018: DEFENDANT'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDING AND VACATE FSC AND TRIAL DATES; DECLARATION OF SCOTT E. BRAYBROOKE;

Declaration

6/13/2018: Declaration

Notice

6/18/2018: Notice

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/27/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/6/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

7/12/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

7/17/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order

1/16/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/9/2017: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/9/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order

4/17/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ERRATA

9/8/2017: NOTICE OF ERRATA

Minute Order

10/26/2017: Minute Order

Opposition

11/15/2017: Opposition

Declaration

11/15/2017: Declaration

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Maria Del Rosario Estrada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Conference (Re Status of Uninsured Motorist Claims and CIGA Proceedings) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference ((as to the Complaint only)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Declaration (of Marshall C. Sanders RE: Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Alexandra Palafox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order ((Conference Re: Status of Uninsured Motorist Claims and CIGA ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Declaration (Re: Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Alexandra Palafox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Maria Del Rosario Estrada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3; (Status Hearing; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2017
  • SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Santigo Higinio Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Maria Del Rosario Estrada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ACCOMMODATIONS BY PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES AND RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Request; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Alexandra Palafox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC640820    Hearing Date: November 05, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ALEXANDRA PALAFOX,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

MARIA DEL ROSARIO ESTRADA, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC640820

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REQUEST MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 5, 2019

The personal injury hub courts are not equipped to handle mandatory settlement conferences, and do not order parties to participate in mandatory settlement conferences. Defendant’s motion to request a mandatory settlement conference is therefore denied. Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.