This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2016 at 22:41:56 (UTC).

ALEXANDER MICHAEL HODEK VS. GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2012 ALEXANDER MICHAEL HODEK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, JOHN J. KRALIK, AMY D. HOGUE, HOWARD J. SCHWAB and ELIA WEINBACH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3738

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

JOHN J. KRALIK

AMY D. HOGUE

HOWARD J. SCHWAB

ELIA WEINBACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HODEK ALEXANDER MICHAEL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

A V PARTY RENTAL INC.

GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC.

SUPER GARDEN CENTERS INC.

TABLES AND CHAIRS CORPORATION

MCCOURT MANUFACURING AN ARKNSAS CORP.

MCCOURT JULIA (DOE 4)

FORT SMITH TABLE AND CHAIR CORPORATION

MARK MCCOURT AS ROE 2

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC.

SUPER GARDEN CENTERS INC.

Other

NASSAR GREGORY E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NASSAR GREGORY E.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADLEY & GMELICH

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & OMERA LLP

Cross Defendant Attorney

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN &

 

Court Documents

CROSS-AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/13/2013: CROSS-AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF 01? SERVICE OF SUMMONS (CROSS.COMPLAINT)

6/5/2013: PROOF 01? SERVICE OF SUMMONS (CROSS.COMPLAINT)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

6/21/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS & EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE,

7/1/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS & EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE,

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUM MARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

7/1/2013: COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUM MARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SIJMMARY ADJUDICA11ON OF ISSUES AS TO PLAINTI

7/1/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SIJMMARY ADJUDICA11ON OF ISSUES AS TO PLAINTI

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO AV PARTY RENTALS? CROS

7/1/2013: COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO AV PARTY RENTALS? CROS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO AV PARTY

7/1/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO AV PARTY

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS & EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE,

7/1/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS & EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE,

AV PARTY RENTAL, INC.?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UI?4DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

7/5/2013: AV PARTY RENTAL, INC.?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UI?4DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC., AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC., DUTY TO DEFEND CROSSCOMPLAINANT, AV PARTY RENTAL, INC., PURSUANT TO

7/5/2013: MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC., AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC., DUTY TO DEFEND CROSSCOMPLAINANT, AV PARTY RENTAL, INC., PURSUANT TO

DEFENDANT, AV PARTY RENTAL, INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETF INC A REARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR A MOTION TO

7/10/2013: DEFENDANT, AV PARTY RENTAL, INC.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETF INC A REARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR A MOTION TO

Minute Order

7/10/2013: Minute Order

ORDER

7/10/2013: ORDER

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/10/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/18/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/18/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CROSS-DEFENDANTS, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.S? AMENDED ANSWER TO AV PARTY RENTAL, INC.?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/16/2013: CROSS-DEFENDANTS, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.S? AMENDED ANSWER TO AV PARTY RENTAL, INC.?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (Cross-Complaint by Tables and Chairs Corporation; ) Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (as to cross-complaint filed by AV PARTY RENTAL, INC. as to cross-defendants TABLE AND CHAIRS CORP. DBA MCCOURT MANUFACTURING, AN ARKANSAS CORPORATION, only ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL,INC., SUPER GARDEN CENTERS ON 02/11/13 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AV PARTY RENTAL, INC. ON 03/15/13 AS TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire Action w/prej.; ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • DocketNotice-Settlement ( ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • DocketOpposition Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • DocketObjection Document Filed Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketDeclaration (of Mark D. McCourt; ) Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketDeclaration (of Robert M. Anderson; ) Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2012
  • DocketOpposition ( TO DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer ( TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (RE: SUMMONS/COMPLNT STATEMENT OF DAMAGES A SIGNED NTC AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF DAMAGES ATTACHED 10/26/12 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS/COMPLNT/STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT SIGNED 10/11/12 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketProof of Service ( RE: SUMMONS/COMPLT/STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT ON 10/24/12 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint (ALEXANDER MICHAEL HODEK VS. GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC.; SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.; A V PARTY RENTAL AND DOES 1-10 ONLY) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Thomas P.'Gmelich, Esq., State Bar No. 166562 o et et tgmelich(@bglawyers.com E_T E EA E EB

Tonya N. Malek, Esq., State Bar No. 273797 1,06 ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

tmalek@bglawyers.com Mark I. Melo, Esq., State Bar No. 192946

mmelo@bglawyers.com o JUL 01 2013 BRADLEY & GMELICH i 700 North Brand Boulevard, 10" Floor JOHN A, ;L“*,R?-*E' CLERKC Glendale, California 91203-1422 j P Telephone: (818) 243-5200 BY L. JOHNSCN, DEPUTY

Facsimile: (818) 243-5266 Attorneys for Defendants/ Cross-Complainants/ Cross- Defendants, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. and SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

ALEXANDER MICHAEL HODEK, Case No. PC 053 738

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS GREEN

THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC.’S

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ASTO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT

GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC,; SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC., AV PARTY RENTAL, INC. and DOES 1 to 10,

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTIONS

. Complaint Filed: September 18, 2012

Discovery Cutoff: September 20, 2013

Motion Cutoft: October 07, 2013

Trial Date: October 22, 2013

Defendants, GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. and SUPER GARDEN CENTERS, INC. (“defendants”) submit the attached exhibits in support of their Motion for

Summary Judgment, or alternatively, Summary Adjudication filed concurrently herewith:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPER GARDEN CENTERS INC. is a litigant