This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2020 at 20:52:16 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO VALENZUELA VS URGP LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2016 ALEJANDRO VALENZUELA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against URGP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL JOHNSON and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2088

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL JOHNSON

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VALENZUELA ALEJANDRO

Defendants and Respondents

URGP LLC

RAIDER 94612 LLC

TALK SHOW 91505 LLC

COMESA 92626 LLC

TOAKS 91362 LLC

U-KO GROVE LLC

A.F. RESTAURANT CONSULTING GROUP INC.

ROSEY SPOT 91105 LLC

UMAMI BURGER HOLLYWOOD RESTAURANT LLC

UMAMI BURGER SANTA MONICA LLC

UMAMI LAGUNA LLC

UMAMI BURGER LLC

UMAMI-LEVITY LLC

UMAMI BURGER HOLLYWOOD LLC

UMAMI BURGER VALLI LLC

UMAMI BURGER LICENSING USA LLC

UMAMI RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

UMAMICATESSEN HOLDINGS LLC

UMAMICATESSEN LLC

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CAPSTONE LAW APC

BANERJEE ARNAB

PEREZ RAUL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ADAMS ADRIAN J. ESQ.

ABLON JANEL R. ESQ.

ADAMS & AUCOIN LLP

HADAWAY CHELSEA E.

ABLON JANEL R

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ((STIP) MOTION PF PLFFS FOR COURT APPROVAL OF THE PARTIES' P....)

7/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ((STIP) MOTION PF PLFFS FOR COURT APPROVAL OF THE PARTIES' P....)

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUS1NESS RECORDS FOR (1) BALDWIN PARK UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; ETC.

3/22/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUS1NESS RECORDS FOR (1) BALDWIN PARK UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; ETC.

Minute Order -

4/17/2018: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT URGP SFV, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/25/2018: DEFENDANT URGP SFV, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore re Anita Alderson, 11843

12/12/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore re Anita Alderson, 11843

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DISMISS DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

8/19/2016: JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DISMISS DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/19/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

11/14/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS URGP, LLC AND URGP SFV, LLC'S MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND IN PLAINTIFFS' FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/18/2017: REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS URGP, LLC AND URGP SFV, LLC'S MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND IN PLAINTIFFS' FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT URGP, LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

6/29/2017: DEFENDANT URGP, LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

DEFENDANT URGP SFV, LLC'S RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT URGP SFV, LLC'S FURTHER RESPONSE TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

6/29/2017: DEFENDANT URGP SFV, LLC'S RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT URGP SFV, LLC'S FURTHER RESPONSE TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT URGP SFV, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

6/29/2017: DEFENDANT URGP SFV, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TRIAL-RELATED DATES; ORDER THEREON

7/28/2017: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TRIAL-RELATED DATES; ORDER THEREON

Minute Order -

11/15/2017: Minute Order -

172 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (for Court Approval of the Parties' PAGA Settlement by Plaintiffs [657439104767]*) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( ((Stip) Motion pf Plffs for Court Approval of the Parties' P....)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketOrder (Approving PAGA Settlement Agreement); Filed by Roya Mousseau (Plaintiff); Mosaic Solomon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketJudgment ((per P.A.G.A. settlement)); Filed by Roya Mousseau (Plaintiff); Mosaic Solomon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roya Mousseau (Plaintiff); Mosaic Solomon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF ROBERT MELLWIG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF THE PARTIES? PAGA SETTLEMENT, AS REQUESTED BY COURT); Filed by URGP SFV, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (for Court Approval of the Parties' PAGA Settlement by Plaintiffs [657439104767]*) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Motion of Plff for Approval of P.A.G.A. Settlement [657439104...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roya Mousseau (Plaintiff); Mosaic Solomon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Raul Perez in Support of the Motion for Court Approval of the Parties? PAGA Settlement); Filed by Roya Mousseau (Plaintiff); Mosaic Solomon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
323 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Alejandro Valenzuela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by URGP, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by URGP, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (1) CIVIL PENALTIES FOR VIOLATIONS OF CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE, PURSUANT TO PAGA, 2698, ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Alejandro Valenzuela (Plaintiff); Mosaic Solomon (Plaintiff); Roya Mousseau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less