This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2019 at 01:21:26 (UTC).

ALEJANDRA CORONA VS RICARDO CORONA

Case Summary

On 01/06/2010 ALEJANDRA CORONA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RICARDO CORONA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WEINBACH, ELIA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7621

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WEINBACH, ELIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CORONA ALEJANDRA

Respondent

CORONA RICARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GARCIA ANTHONY RAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2015
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (of Record LKA for Petitioner not given on fo rm. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Corona, Alejandra ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Declaration - Default FL170

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • at 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2D, Weinbach, Elia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Order - Findings and Order After Hearing (court's re child support - Signed on 2010-02-24 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • Agreement - Conciliation Court

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2010
  • Responsive Declaration (resp )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Corona, Ricardo ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Corona, Ricardo ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Corona, Ricardo - Granted on 2010-02-10 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Corona, Alejandra ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • RFO/MTN - Child Custody and/or Visitation (by apet - Hearing Set on 2010-02-24 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Corona, Alejandra ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Corona, Alejandra ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Corona, Alejandra ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA ANTHONY R