This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 22:26:38 (UTC).

ALDANA, JOSE DE JESUS VS CHAGOYAN, ELSA LAURA

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 ALDANA, JOSE DE JESUS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHAGOYAN, ELSA LAURA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MINK, MICHAEL S. and GELFOUND, DAVID B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3624

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MINK, MICHAEL S.

GELFOUND, DAVID B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALDANA JOSE DE JESUS

Respondent

CHAGOYAN ELSA LAURA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WHITE GRACE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F51, Mink, Michael S., Presiding; Default Prove Up Trial - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F51, Mink, Michael S., Presiding; Default Prove Up Trial - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Declaration (of Grace White in Support of Request for Continuance of Prove up Default ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Request - Default Setting; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Chatsworth Dept. - F39, Gelfound, David B., Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 03-02-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aldana, Jose ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (10/06/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (10/06/2016 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.