This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2016 at 08:43:44 (UTC).

ALBERTO RANGEL VS MARIA E RANGEL

Case Summary

On 10/17/2011 ALBERTO RANGEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARIA E RANGEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BORENSTEIN, MARK A. and IWASAKI, BRUCE G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3186

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BORENSTEIN, MARK A.

IWASAKI, BRUCE G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RANGEL ALBERTO

Respondent

RANGEL MARIA E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

WOLF SUSAN J

CAREY DIANE B.

Respondent Attorney

GARCIA ANTHONY R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2016
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Declaration-Serv Pre/Final Dec Dis Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Agreement-Conciliation Crt-& Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Notice-Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Request-Trial Setting Long Cause Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • Responsive Declaration Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Request-Modification Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Miscellaneous Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2012
  • Proof of Service Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • Verification of Completion Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • Agreement-Conciliation Crt-& Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • Response Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • OSC-Custody, Support, etc. Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA ANTHONY R