This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:47:18 (UTC).

ALBERT BARSOUMIAN ET AL VS G D BACA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/22/2016 ALBERT BARSOUMIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against G D BACA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1179

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

BARSOUMIAN SONIA

BARSOUMIAN ALBERT

VOGE INC

CONSTRUCTION & RENMODELING

BANK OF AMERICA NA

ALCH WILLIAM

THOMAS JAYNEE

MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY

BARSOUMIAN ARA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

BACA GARY

DOES 1-10

COUNTERPOINT PUBLIC ADJUSTING

VOGE INC

CONSTRUCTION & RENMODELING

G.B. BACA INC

G.D. BACA INC

ADJUSTING COUNTERPOINT PUBLIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LOSH & KHOSHLESAN LLP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/6/2018: Request for Dismissal

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

4/21/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

DEFENDANTS G.D. BACA, INC. DBA COUNTERPOINT PUBLIC ADJUSTING AND GARY BACA'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/24/2016: DEFENDANTS G.D. BACA, INC. DBA COUNTERPOINT PUBLIC ADJUSTING AND GARY BACA'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

GENERAL DENIAL TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/7/2016: GENERAL DENIAL TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/28/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS ALBERT AND SONIA BARSOUMIAN ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/19/2016: PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS ALBERT AND SONIA BARSOUMIAN ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/4/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS C. STASTNY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/19/2016: DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS C. STASTNY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/7/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/7/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CROSS-DEFENDANT MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF G.D. BACA, INC., DBA COUNTERPOINT PUBLIC ADJUSTING AND GARY BACA

1/31/2017: CROSS-DEFENDANT MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF G.D. BACA, INC., DBA COUNTERPOINT PUBLIC ADJUSTING AND GARY BACA

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

2/7/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

2/22/2017: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

MEMO OF COSTS

3/17/2017: MEMO OF COSTS

PLAINTIFFS AND CROSSDEFENDANTS ALBERT AND SONIA BARSOUMIAN ANSWER TO CROSS- COMPLAINANTS G.D. BACA, INC. AND GARY BACA'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT

4/18/2017: PLAINTIFFS AND CROSSDEFENDANTS ALBERT AND SONIA BARSOUMIAN ANSWER TO CROSS- COMPLAINANTS G.D. BACA, INC. AND GARY BACA'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT

Minute Order

6/2/2017: Minute Order

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF ARA BARSOUMIAN

8/28/2017: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF ARA BARSOUMIAN

Minute Order

9/11/2017: Minute Order

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Albert Barsoumian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal) of 11/28/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Status Conference (Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
161 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Albert Barsoumian (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Albert Barsoumian (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSTRUCTION & REMODELING is a litigant

Latest cases where G.D. BACA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where VOGE INC. CONSTRUCTION & REMODELING is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant