This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 11:48:32 (UTC).

AKRUM ALRAHIB VS ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2016 AKRUM ALRAHIB filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5998

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALRAHIB AKRUM

Defendants

ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA INC.

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

ROLLS-ROYCE AND BMW

NADERI RAMIN

ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS NA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLINE BRIAN K.

BYLUND LUKAS KERMIT

CHAE LARRY

BYLUND LUKAS K.

CLINE BRIAN KELLY

CLINE APC

Defendant Attorneys

LEHRMAN LAW GROUP

TALLENT ERIN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Reply

5/7/2019: Reply

Stipulation

5/8/2019: Stipulation

Minute Order

5/14/2019: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

5/14/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/17/2016: Complaint

Summons

6/17/2016: Summons

Unknown

6/27/2016: Unknown

Unknown

7/21/2016: Unknown

Unknown

8/11/2016: Unknown

Unknown

8/23/2016: Unknown

Other -

9/19/2016: Other -

Case Management Statement

9/19/2016: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/19/2016: Answer

Other -

9/19/2016: Other -

Other -

9/26/2016: Other -

Unknown

10/4/2016: Unknown

Other -

10/4/2016: Other -

135 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department K; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (relieving responding party from waiver, requests for production) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (for order relieving responding party from waiver interrogatories) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (relieving responding party from waiver -admissions) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (relieving responding party from waiver - request for admissions) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel ((Motion to Compel)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Relieving Responding Party from Waiver Interrogatories) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel ((Motion to Compel)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Plaintiff's inability to pay a pro rata share of the fees) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
271 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint (INCORRECT NAME ROLLS-ROYCE NORTH AMERICA INC. TRUE NAME BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Akrum Alrahib (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Akrum Alrahib (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Akrum Alrahib (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rolls-Royce North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS NA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TALLENT ERIN