Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 11:03:05 (UTC).

AILING SUN VS DOUBLE HI EXPRESS TOURS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/05/2012 AILING SUN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DOUBLE HI EXPRESS TOURS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5187

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SUN AILING

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

DOUBLE HI EXPRESS TOURS INC.

WONG HAI JIE

Other

SCHECTER DANIEL SCOTT ESQ.

Not Classified By Court

SOTOMAYOR RANDE S. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NEIGHBORHOOD LEGAL SERVICES OF L A COUNTY

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KIM DAVID ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/27/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/7/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/31/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING

4/15/2013: NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING

FIRST STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT

4/29/2013: FIRST STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT

7/29/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT

NOTICE OF CORRI;CT ION RIO EXHIBIT TWO OF DECI.,ARATION OF DAVID PALLACK IN MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/31/2013: NOTICE OF CORRI;CT ION RIO EXHIBIT TWO OF DECI.,ARATION OF DAVID PALLACK IN MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

8/13/2013: OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF .IOSE TELLO

8/19/2013: PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF .IOSE TELLO

PLAINTIFF?S SUPER CEDING 10-PAGE REPL V RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JOSE TELLO

8/21/2013: PLAINTIFF?S SUPER CEDING 10-PAGE REPL V RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JOSE TELLO

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

8/26/2013: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

Minute Order -

8/26/2013: Minute Order -

CROSS COMPLAINT FOR ACCOUNTING

9/26/2013: CROSS COMPLAINT FOR ACCOUNTING

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

10/24/2013: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

5/15/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

7/18/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

7/25/2014: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

8/5/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • DocketReceipt-Depository (reimbursed filing fees $495. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (SEPT 12, 2014 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Jury Trial (5 DAY EST.) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Final Status Conference (STAYED PER STIPULATION AND ORDEROF 5/14/14OSC RE DISMISSAL 7/18/14) - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons ((2) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOUBLE HI EXPRESS TOURS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant