This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 10:42:51 (UTC).

AHMED BAGHAT, ET AL., VS MOHAMMAD HOSSEIN HAVAEI

Case Summary

On 04/23/2015 AHMED BAGHAT, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MOHAMMAD HOSSEIN HAVAEI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4077

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BAGHAT AHMED

BAGHAT HALA

ROES 1-50

BAGHAT DINA

Defendants

HAVAEI MOHAMMAD HOSSEIN

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY

LAND OF CONSTRUCTION

SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MINOOFAR PEDRAM

LAW OFFICES OF AHMED M. ELMOKADEM

Defendant Attorneys

HAUSMAN & SOSA

REGHABI ROSS K.

GASCOU CHRISTIAN J.

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

6/2/2015: Legacy Document

General Denial

7/20/2015: General Denial

Legacy Document

4/6/2018: Legacy Document

Ex Parte Application

2/28/2019: Ex Parte Application

Legacy Document

3/29/2017: Legacy Document

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/20/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

6/29/2015: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document

4/12/2018: Legacy Document

Substitution of Attorney

8/10/2015: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

7/17/2015: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document

3/29/2017: Legacy Document

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/29/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/29/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Summons

4/23/2015: Summons

Legacy Document

3/15/2016: Legacy Document

Minute Order

8/10/2015: Minute Order

Legacy Document

8/11/2015: Legacy Document

Ex Parte Application

2/28/2019: Ex Parte Application

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Continuance of Trial and Pretrial Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application by Ahmed Bahgat, Hala Bahgat and Dina Ba...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (for Continuance of Trial and Pretrial Dates); Filed by Ahmed Baghat (Legacy Party); Hala Baghat (Legacy Party); DINA BAGHAT (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Declaration (Ahmed M. Elmokadem); Filed by Ahmed Baghat (Legacy Party); Hala Baghat (Legacy Party); DINA BAGHAT (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Declaration (Ahmed Bahgat); Filed by Ahmed Baghat (Legacy Party); Hala Baghat (Legacy Party); DINA BAGHAT (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
197 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint (DOE 102 SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Ahmed Baghat (Legacy Party); Hala Baghat (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint (DOE 101 NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Ahmed Baghat (Legacy Party); Hala Baghat (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.