This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 20:20:37 (UTC).

AGUSTIN GONZALEZ, ET. AL VS. DENBESTE ENGINE CO.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 AGUSTIN GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DENBESTE ENGINE CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8576

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIGUEL CORTES

AGUSTIN GONZALEZ JR.

AGUSTIN GONZALEZ

ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS

GONZALEZ AGUSTIN

CORTES MIGUEL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

CARROLL SHELBY ENGINE CO.

DENBESTE ENGINE CO. LLC

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAHAM DANIEL M. LAW OFFICES OF .

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

AQUI DIANE

FREEMAN RICHARD W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by AGUSTIN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); JR. AGUSTIN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); MIGUEL CORTES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION NOTE: X-COMPLT. PRVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 03/21/18); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by DENBESTE ENGINE CO., LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (DISMISSING THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DENBESTE ENGINE CO., LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/X-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Notice (OF REJECTION OF RQ. FOR DISMISSAL RCVD. ON 03/19/18 AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION 1) IN ORDER TO DISMISS THE ENTIRE ACTION THE SIGNATURE OF THE X- COMPLT/ATTORNEY IS REQUIRED); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • at 09:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Jury Trial (5 DAY ESTIMATE**NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 2/20/18**) - Advanced to this date & Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Notice; Filed by AGUSTIN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); JR. AGUSTIN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); MIGUEL CORTES (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
157 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2017
  • Summons; Filed by DENBESTE ENGINE CO., LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (DENBESTE ENGINE CO., LLC DBA CARROLL SHELBY ENGINE CO. VS. AGUSTIN GONZALEZ, AGUSTIN GONZALEZ, JR. *DISMISSED ON 03/21/18*); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by AGUSTIN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); JR. AGUSTIN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); MIGUEL CORTES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by AGUSTIN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); JR. AGUSTIN GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); MIGUEL CORTES (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less