This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 06:14:14 (UTC).

AGUILAR, NANCY LYNN VS AGUILAR, LUIS EDUARDO

Case Summary

On 11/22/2016 AGUILAR, NANCY LYNN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AGUILAR, LUIS EDUARDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GELFOUND, DAVID B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3957

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GELFOUND, DAVID B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AGUILAR NANCY LYNN

Respondent

AGUILAR LUIS EDUARDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2017
  • Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aguilar, Nancy - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-18 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aguilar, Nancy - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-18 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aguilar, Nancy - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-18 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Chatsworth Dept. - F39, Gelfound, David B., Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Chatsworth Dept. - F39, Gelfound, David B., Presiding; Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aguilar, Nancy ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aguilar, Nancy ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aguilar, Nancy ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aguilar, Nancy ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 03-30-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-09-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aguilar, Nancy ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aguilar, Nancy ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Aguilar, Nancy ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.