This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 23:31:29 (UTC).

AFSHAN MULTANI, ET AL VS. WITKIN & NEAL, LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/08/2010 AFSHAN MULTANI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WITKIN NEAL, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are C. EDWARD SIMPSON, LAURA A. MATZ, JAN A. PLUIM, JOHN P. DOYLE and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4440

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

LAURA A. MATZ

JAN A. PLUIM

JOHN P. DOYLE

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MULTANI AFSHAN

MULTANI RAHIM

Defendants

MARTINEZ JOSE E.

ARGENTO DANIEL

BANKS RANDY

APB PROFPERTIES LLC DOE 1

NEAL AUDREY L.

LB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

CADY JAN

MORTON JENNIFER

DOES 1 TO 50

AMERICAN TEAM REALTY PROPERTIES INC.

WITKIN & NEAL LLC

SBS LIEN SERVICES

SBS LIEN SERVICES F/K/A CALIFORNIA LIEN

AMERICAN TEAM REALTY PROPERTIES

WARREN DONALD

PRO VALUE PROPERTIES INC.

Not Classified By Court

HOSP F. PHILLIP

Other

HOEFFNER CHRISTINE T. ESQ.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE FOXX FIRM PLC

THE GORDON LAW FIRM APC

KURTZ GARY

STEVEN SANDLER ESQ.

ESQ. STEVEN SANDLER

KURTZ GARY ALAN

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARDSON HARMAN OBER PC

RICHARDSON & HARMAN

BRANDON J. ANAND

VICKEN I. SIMONIAN

FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

ROSS WERSCHING & WOLCOTT LLP

SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

CORPORATE LEGAL SERVICES LLP

DAVIS JONATHAN ROBERT

RICHARDSON KELLY GENE

KELLY G. RICHARDSON

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/27/2011: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

3/28/2011: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

4/20/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

11/1/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Legacy Document

7/2/2013: Legacy Document

Substitution of Attorney

3/7/2014: Substitution of Attorney

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

4/8/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

5/9/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2014-05-16 00:00:00

5/16/2014: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2014-05-16 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION

7/16/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

11/3/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NTC TO PRTY RE FEE CLK'S TRANSCPT

4/1/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NTC TO PRTY RE FEE CLK'S TRANSCPT

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

6/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

8/17/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

10/24/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST

1/4/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

11/4/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/06/2020

4/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/06/2020

516 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (for Release of Bond Pursuant to CCP 996.110) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order for Release of Bond Pursuant to C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketOrder (Proposed Order re Application for Release of Bond); Filed by WITKIN & NEAL, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (for Release of Bond Pursuant to CCP 996.110) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (for Release of Bond Pursuant to CCP 996.110) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1,311 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2010
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by AFSHAN MULTANI (Plaintiff); RAHIM MULTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • DocketNotice-Pending Action; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by AFSHAN MULTANI (Plaintiff); RAHIM MULTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • DocketNotice-Pending Action; Filed by AFSHAN MULTANI (Plaintiff); RAHIM MULTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint (NO SUMMONS ISSUED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • DocketComplaint Fld - No Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AFSHAN MULTANI (Plaintiff); RAHIM MULTANI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: GC044440    Hearing Date: June 22, 2020    Dept: E

APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF BOND

[CCP §996.110]

Date: 6/22/20 (3:00 PM)

Case: Multani, et al. v. Castle Green Homeowners Association et al. (GC 044440)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Castle Green Homeowners Association’s and LB Property Management’s UNOPPOSED Application for Release of Bond, on behalf of Platte River Insurance Company’s, is GRANTED. Pursuant to CCP § 996.110, the Court finds that plaintiffs would not be injured from release of the bond because the judgment entered in favor of plaintiffs has been satisfied. (Sandoval Decl. ¶ 8 & Ex. 7.) The surety on the $664,566.00 bond, filed on November 14, 2016, is ordered RELEASED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WITKIN & NEAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KURTZ GARY ALAN